Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB524 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+IB
2+Union Calendar No. 347
13 118THCONGRESS
24 2
35 DSESSION H. R. 524
4-AN ACT
6+[Report No. 118–421]
7+To amend the Coastal Barrier Resources Act to create an exemption for
8+certain shoreline borrow sites.
9+IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
10+JANUARY25, 2023
11+Mr. R
12+OUZERintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the
13+Committee on Natural Resources
14+M
15+ARCH12, 2024
16+Additional sponsors: Ms. M
17+ACE, Mr. FLEISCHMANN, and Mr. VANDREW
18+M
19+ARCH12, 2024
20+Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole
21+House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed
22+[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic]
23+[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on January 25, 2023]
24+VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:13 Mar 13, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H524.RH H524
25+ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2
26+•HR 524 RH
27+A BILL
528 To amend the Coastal Barrier Resources Act to create an
629 exemption for certain shoreline borrow sites.
30+VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:13 Mar 13, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H524.RH H524
31+ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3
32+•HR 524 RH
733 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
8-tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 2
9-•HR 524 EH
10-SECTION 1. FEDERAL COASTAL STORM RISK MANAGEMENT 1
11-PROJECTS. 2
12-Section 6(a) of the Coastal Barrier Resources Act (16 3
13-U.S.C. 3505(a)) is amended by adding at the end the fol-4
14-lowing: 5
15-‘‘(7) Use of a sand source within a System unit 6
16-by Federal coastal storm risk management projects 7
17-or their predecessor projects that have used a sys-8
18-tem unit for sand to nourish adjacent beaches out-9
19-side the System pursuant to section 5 of the Act of 10
20-August 18, 1941 (commonly known as the ‘Flood 11
21-Control Act of 1941’) (55 Stat. 650, chapter 377; 12
22-33 U.S.C. 701n) at least once between December 13
23-31, 2008 and December 31, 2023 in response to an 14
24-emergency situation prior to December 31, 2023.’’. 15
25-Passed the House of Representatives April 11, 2024.
26-Attest:
27-Clerk. 118
34+tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
35+SECTION 1. FEDERAL COASTAL STORM RISK MANAGEMENT 3
36+PROJECTS. 4
37+Section 6(a) of the Coastal Barrier Resources Act (16 5
38+U.S.C. 3505(a)) is amended by adding at the end the fol-6
39+lowing: 7
40+‘‘(7) Use of a sand source within a System unit 8
41+by Federal coastal storm risk management projects or 9
42+their predecessor projects that have used a system unit 10
43+for sand to nourish adjacent beaches outside the Sys-11
44+tem pursuant to section 5 of the Act of August 18, 12
45+1941 (commonly known as the ‘Flood Control Act of 13
46+1941’) (55 Stat. 650, chapter 377; 33 U.S.C. 701n) at 14
47+least once between December 31, 2008 and December 15
48+31, 2023 in response to an emergency situation prior 16
49+to December 31, 2023.’’. 17
50+VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:13 Mar 13, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H524.RH H524
51+ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No.
52+347
53+118
2854 TH
2955 CONGRESS
3056 2
3157 D
3258 S
3359 ESSION
3460
3561 H. R. 524
36-AN ACT
62+[Report No. 118–421]
63+A BILL
3764 To amend the Coastal Barrier Resources Act to
3865 create an exemption for certain shoreline borrow
3966 sites.
67+M
68+ARCH
69+12, 2024
70+Reported with an amendment, committed to the Com-
71+mittee of the Whole House on the State of the Union,
72+and ordered to be printed
73+VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:13 Mar 13, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H524.RH H524
74+ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS