Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB5260 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 08/26/2023

                            I 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 5260 
To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021, 
to modify the prohibition on the acquisition by the Department of De-
fense of certain items containing a perfluoroalkyl substance or 
polyfluoroalkyl substance. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
AUGUST22, 2023 
Ms. S
LOTKIN(for herself and Mr. POSEY) introduced the following bill; which 
was referred to the Committee on Armed Services 
A BILL 
To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal 
Year 2021, to modify the prohibition on the acquisition 
by the Department of Defense of certain items con-
taining a perfluoroalkyl substance or polyfluoroalkyl sub-
stance. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘PFAS Free Military 4
Purchasing Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:02 Aug 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5260.IH H5260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 5260 IH
SEC. 2. RESTRICTION ON DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE AC-1
QUISITION OF COVERED ITEMS CONTAINING 2
OR PRODUCED USING CERTAIN SUBSTANCES. 3
(a) M
ODIFICATION.—Section 333 of the National De-4
fense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021 (Public Law 5
116–283; 10 U.S.C. 3062 note; 134 Stat. 3531) is amend-6
ed to read as follows: 7
‘‘SEC. 333. RESTRICTION ON DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE AC-8
QUISITION OF COVERED ITEMS CONTAINING 9
OR PRODUCED USING CERTAIN SUBSTANCES. 10
‘‘(a) P
ROHIBITIONBEGINNINGAPRIL1, 2023.— 11
‘‘(1) P
ROHIBITION.—During the period begin-12
ning on April 1, 2023, and ending on April 1, 2025, 13
the Secretary of Defense may not acquire any cov-14
ered item that contains perfluorooctane sulfonate 15
(PFOS) or perfluorooctanoic acid (PFOA). 16
‘‘(2) C
OVERED ITEM DEFINED .—In this sub-17
section, the term ‘covered item’ means— 18
‘‘(A) nonstick cookware or cooking utensils 19
for use in galleys or dining facilities; and 20
‘‘(B) upholstered furniture, carpets, and 21
rugs that have been treated with stain-resistant 22
coatings. 23
‘‘(b) P
ROHIBITIONBEGINNINGAPRIL1, 2025.— 24
‘‘(1) P
ROHIBITION.—Beginning on April 1, 25
2025, the Secretary of Defense may not acquire any 26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:02 Aug 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5260.IH H5260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 5260 IH
covered item that contains or is produced using any 1
of the following: 2
‘‘(A) Perfluorooctane sulfonate (PFOS). 3
‘‘(B) Perfluorooctanoic acid (PFOA). 4
‘‘(C) Perfluorobutane sulfonate (PFBS). 5
‘‘(D) Perfluorobutanoic acid (PFBA). 6
‘‘(E) Perfluorohexanoic acid (PFHxA). 7
‘‘(F) Perfluoroheptanoic acid (PFHpA). 8
‘‘(G) Perfluorohexanesulfonic acid 9
(PFHxS). 10
‘‘(H) Perfluoroheptane sulfonic acid 11
(PFHpS). 12
‘‘(I) Perfluorononanoic acid (PFNA). 13
‘‘(J) Perfluorodecanoic Acid (PFDA). 14
‘‘(K) Perfluoroundecanoic acid (PFUnA). 15
‘‘(L) Perfluorododecanoic acid (PFDoDA). 16
‘‘(M) Perfluorooctanesulfonamide (PFOSA 17
or FOSA). 18
‘‘(N) Hexafluoropropylene Oxide (HFPO) 19
Dimer Acid (GenX). 20
‘‘(2) I
MPLEMENTATION.—In carrying out this 21
subsection, the Secretary shall include the prohibi-22
tion under paragraph (1) as a term in any contract 23
or other agreement entered into on or after April 1, 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:02 Aug 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5260.IH H5260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HR 5260 IH
2025, by the Secretary for the acquisition of a cov-1
ered item. 2
‘‘(3) R
ULE OF CONSTRUCTION .—Nothing in 3
this subsection shall be construed as— 4
‘‘(A) requiring the disposal of, or otherwise 5
affecting, covered items acquired by the Sec-6
retary of Defense prior to April 1, 2025; or 7
‘‘(B) imposing an obligation on the Sec-8
retary to test covered items to confirm the ab-9
sence of perfluoroalkyl substances or 10
polyfluoroalkyl substances. 11
‘‘(4) D
EFINITIONS.—In this subsection: 12
‘‘(A) The term ‘covered item’ means— 13
‘‘(i) non-stick cookware or food service 14
ware for use in galleys or dining facilities; 15
‘‘(ii) food packaging materials; 16
‘‘(iii) cleaning products, including 17
floor waxes; 18
‘‘(iv) carpeting; 19
‘‘(v) rugs, curtains, or upholstered 20
furniture; 21
‘‘(vi) sunscreen; 22
‘‘(vii) shoes and clothing for which 23
treatment with a perfluoroalkyl substance 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:02 Aug 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5260.IH H5260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 5 
•HR 5260 IH
or polyfluoroalkyl substance is not nec-1
essary for an essential function; and 2
‘‘(viii) such other items as may be de-3
termined by the Secretary. 4
‘‘(B) The term ‘perfluoroalkyl substance’ 5
means a man-made chemical of which all of the 6
carbon atoms are fully fluorinated carbon 7
atoms. 8
‘‘(C) The term ‘polyfluoroalkyl substance’ 9
means a man-made chemical containing at least 10
one fully fluorinated carbon atom and at least 11
one nonfluorinated carbon atom.’’. 12
(b) A
NNUALREPORTS.— 13
(1) R
EPORTS.—Not later than 270 days after 14
the date of the enactment of this Act, and annually 15
thereafter, the Secretary of Defense shall submit to 16
the Committees on Armed Services of the House of 17
Representatives and the Senate a report containing 18
a detailed description of the following: 19
(A) Steps taken to identify covered items 20
acquired by the Secretary of Defense that con-21
tain or are produced using perfluoroalkyl sub-22
stances or polyfluoroalkyl substances. 23
(B) Steps taken to limit the acquisition by 24
the Secretary of covered items that contain or 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:02 Aug 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H5260.IH H5260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 6 
•HR 5260 IH
are produced using perfluoroalkyl substances or 1
polyfluoroalkyl substances. 2
(C) Planned steps of the Secretary to limit 3
the acquisition of covered items that contain or 4
are produced using perfluoroalkyl substances or 5
polyfluoroalkyl substances. 6
(2) D
EFINITIONS.—In this subsection, the 7
terms ‘‘covered item’’, ‘‘perfluoroalkyl substance’’, 8
and ‘‘polyfluoroalkyl substance’’ have the meanings 9
given those terms in section 333(b) of the National 10
Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021 11
(Public Law 116–283; 10 U.S.C. 3062 note; 134 12
Stat. 3531), as amended by subsection (a). 13
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:02 Aug 25, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H5260.IH H5260
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB