Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB6322 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-IB
2-Union Calendar No. 704
1+I
32 118THCONGRESS
4-2
5-DSESSION H. R. 6322
6-[Report No. 118–799, Part I]
3+1
4+STSESSION H. R. 6322
75 To evaluate and disrupt financing to Hamas, and to amend title 31, United
86 States Code, to prohibit the exchange stabilization fund from being
97 used to deal in Special Drawing Rights from state sponsors of terrorism,
108 and for other purposes.
119 IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
1210 NOVEMBER9, 2023
1311 Mr. S
1412 TEIL(for himself and Ms. PETTERSEN) introduced the following bill;
1513 which was referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addi-
1614 tion to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently
1715 determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provi-
1816 sions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned
19-D
20-ECEMBER5, 2024
21-Reported from the Committee on Financial Services with an amendment
22-[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic]
23-DECEMBER5, 2024
24-Referral to the Committee on Foreign Affairs extended for a period ending
25-not later than December 19, 2024
26-D
27-ECEMBER12, 2024
28-Additional sponsors: Mr. M
29-EUSER, Mr. WILSONof South Carolina, Mr. BARR,
30-Mr. S
31-ESSIONS, Mr. SHERMAN, Mr. SUOZZI, Mr. MOSKOWITZand Mr.
32-F
33-ITZPATRICK
34-D
35-ECEMBER12, 2024
36-Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged; committed to the Committee of the
37-Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed
38-[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on November 9, 2023]
39-VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:32 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
40-DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 2
41-•HR 6322 RH
4217 A BILL
4318 To evaluate and disrupt financing to Hamas, and to amend
4419 title 31, United States Code, to prohibit the exchange
4520 stabilization fund from being used to deal in Special
4621 Drawing Rights from state sponsors of terrorism, and
4722 for other purposes.
48-VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
49-DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 3
50-•HR 6322 RH
5123 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
5224 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
5325 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
5426 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘End Financing for 4
5527 Hamas and State Sponsors of Terrorism Act’’. 5
56-SEC. 2. REPORT ON FINANCING FOR HAMAS. 6
57-Not later than 180 days after the date of the enactment 7
58-of this Act, the Secretary of the Treasury shall submit to 8
59-the Committee on Financial Services of the House of Rep-9
60-resentatives and the Committee on Banking, Housing, and 10
61-Urban Affairs of the Senate a report (which shall be in un-11
62-classified form but may include a classified annex) that in-12
63-cludes— 13
64-(1) an analysis of the major sources of financing 14
65-to Hamas; 15
66-(2) a description of United States and multilat-16
67-eral efforts to disrupt illicit financial flows involving 17
68-Hamas; 18
69-(3) an evaluation of United States efforts to un-19
70-dermine the ability of Hamas to finance armed hos-20
71-tilities against Israel; and 21
72-(4) an implementation plan with respect to the 22
73-multilateral strategy described in section 3. 23
74-VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
75-DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 4
76-•HR 6322 RH
77-SEC. 3. MULTILATERAL STRATEGY TO DISRUPT HAMAS FI-1
78-NANCING. 2
79-The Secretary of the Treasury, through participation 3
80-in the G7, and other appropriate fora, shall develop a strat-4
81-egy in coordination with United States allies and partners 5
82-to ensure that Hamas is incapable of financing armed hos-6
83-tilities against Israel. 7
84-SEC. 4. PROHIBITION ON USE OF THE EXCHANGE STA-8
85-BILIZATION FUND TO EXCHANGE SPECIAL 9
86-DRAWING RIGHTS OF, OR TO BENEFIT, STATE 10
87-SPONSORS OF TERRORISM. 11
88-Section 5302 of title 31, United States Code, is amend-12
89-ed by adding at the end the following: 13
28+VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:58 Nov 13, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6322.IH H6322
29+kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2
30+•HR 6322 IH
31+SEC. 2. REPORT ON HAMAS FINANCING. 1
32+Not later than 180 days after the date of the enact-2
33+ment of this Act, the Secretary of the Treasury shall sub-3
34+mit to the Committee on Financial Services of the House 4
35+of Representatives and the Committee on Banking, Hous-5
36+ing, and Urban Affairs of the Senate a report (which shall 6
37+be in unclassified form but may include a classified annex) 7
38+that includes— 8
39+(1) an analysis of the major sources of financ-9
40+ing to Hamas; 10
41+(2) a description of United States and multilat-11
42+eral efforts to disrupt illicit financial flows involving 12
43+Hamas; 13
44+(3) an evaluation of United States efforts to 14
45+undermine the ability of Hamas to finance armed 15
46+hostilities against Israel; and 16
47+(4) an implementation plan with respect to the 17
48+multilateral strategy described in section 3. 18
49+SEC. 3. MULTILATERAL STRATEGY TO DISRUPT HAMAS FI-19
50+NANCING. 20
51+The Secretary of the Treasury, through participation 21
52+in the G7, and other appropriate fora, shall develop a 22
53+strategy in coordination with United States allies and 23
54+partners to ensure that Hamas is incapable of financing 24
55+armed hostilities against Israel. 25
56+VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:58 Nov 13, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H6322.IH H6322
57+kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3
58+•HR 6322 IH
59+SEC. 4. PROHIBITION ON USE OF THE EXCHANGE STA-1
60+BILIZATION FUND TO EXCHANGE SPECIAL 2
61+DRAWING RIGHTS OF, OR TO BENEFIT, STATE 3
62+SPONSORS OF TERRORISM. 4
63+Section 5302 of title 31, United States Code, is 5
64+amended by adding at the end the following: 6
9065 ‘‘(e) P
91-ROHIBITION ONUSE OFFUND TOEXCHANGE 14
66+ROHIBITION ONUSE OFFUNDTOEXCHANGE 7
9267 S
93-PECIALDRAWINGRIGHTS OF, OR TOBENEFIT, ASTATE 15
68+PECIALDRAWINGRIGHTS OF, ORTOBENEFIT, ASTATE 8
9469 S
95-PONSOR OFTERRORISM.—The Secretary may not use the 16
96-fund to— 17
97-‘‘(1) deal in Special Drawing Rights from any 18
98-country determined by the Secretary of State to have 19
99-repeatedly provided support for acts of international 20
100-terrorism, as designated pursuant to section 1754(c) 21
101-of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal 22
102-Year 2019, section 40 of the Arms Export Control 23
103-Act, or section 620A of the Foreign Assistance Act of 24
104-1961; or 25
105-VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
106-DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 5
107-•HR 6322 RH
108-‘‘(2) deal in Special Drawing Rights with any 1
109-other country in a manner that the Secretary finds 2
110-will result in the direct provision of funds to a coun-3
111-try referred to in paragraph (1).’’. 4
112-VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
113-DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No.
114-704
115-118
116-TH
117-CONGRESS
118-2
119-D
120-S
121-ESSION
122-
123-H. R. 6322
124-[Report No. 118–799, Part I]
125-A BILL
126-To evaluate and disrupt financing to Hamas, and
127-to amend title 31, United States Code, to pro-
128-hibit the exchange stabilization fund from being
129-used to deal in Special Drawing Rights from
130-state sponsors of terrorism, and for other pur-
131-poses.
132-D
133-ECEMBER
134-12, 2024
135-Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged; committed to
136-the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the
137-Union and ordered to be printed
138-VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
139-DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS
70+PONSOR OFTERRORISM.—The Secretary may not use 9
71+the fund to— 10
72+‘‘(1) deal in Special Drawing Rights from any 11
73+country determined by the Secretary of State to 12
74+have repeatedly provided support for acts of inter-13
75+national terrorism, as designated pursuant to section 14
76+1754(c) of the National Defense Authorization Act 15
77+for Fiscal Year 2019, section 40 of the Arms Export 16
78+Control Act, or section 620A of the Foreign Assist-17
79+ance Act of 1961; or 18
80+‘‘(2) engage in a transaction with any other en-19
81+tity that will result in the provision of any asset to 20
82+such a country.’’. 21
83+Æ
84+VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:58 Nov 13, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H6322.IH H6322
85+kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB