Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB6322 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/13/2024

                            IB 
Union Calendar No. 704 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. R. 6322 
[Report No. 118–799, Part I] 
To evaluate and disrupt financing to Hamas, and to amend title 31, United 
States Code, to prohibit the exchange stabilization fund from being 
used to deal in Special Drawing Rights from state sponsors of terrorism, 
and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
NOVEMBER9, 2023 
Mr. S
TEIL(for himself and Ms. PETTERSEN) introduced the following bill; 
which was referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addi-
tion to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently 
determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provi-
sions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned 
D
ECEMBER5, 2024 
Reported from the Committee on Financial Services with an amendment 
[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic] 
DECEMBER5, 2024 
Referral to the Committee on Foreign Affairs extended for a period ending 
not later than December 19, 2024 
D
ECEMBER12, 2024 
Additional sponsors: Mr. M
EUSER, Mr. WILSONof South Carolina, Mr. BARR, 
Mr. S
ESSIONS, Mr. SHERMAN, Mr. SUOZZI, Mr. MOSKOWITZand Mr. 
F
ITZPATRICK 
D
ECEMBER12, 2024 
Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged; committed to the Committee of the 
Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed 
[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on November 9, 2023] 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:32 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 2 
•HR 6322 RH
A BILL 
To evaluate and disrupt financing to Hamas, and to amend 
title 31, United States Code, to prohibit the exchange 
stabilization fund from being used to deal in Special 
Drawing Rights from state sponsors of terrorism, and 
for other purposes. 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6652 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 3 
•HR 6322 RH
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘End Financing for 4
Hamas and State Sponsors of Terrorism Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. REPORT ON FINANCING FOR HAMAS. 6
Not later than 180 days after the date of the enactment 7
of this Act, the Secretary of the Treasury shall submit to 8
the Committee on Financial Services of the House of Rep-9
resentatives and the Committee on Banking, Housing, and 10
Urban Affairs of the Senate a report (which shall be in un-11
classified form but may include a classified annex) that in-12
cludes— 13
(1) an analysis of the major sources of financing 14
to Hamas; 15
(2) a description of United States and multilat-16
eral efforts to disrupt illicit financial flows involving 17
Hamas; 18
(3) an evaluation of United States efforts to un-19
dermine the ability of Hamas to finance armed hos-20
tilities against Israel; and 21
(4) an implementation plan with respect to the 22
multilateral strategy described in section 3. 23
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 4 
•HR 6322 RH
SEC. 3. MULTILATERAL STRATEGY TO DISRUPT HAMAS FI-1
NANCING. 2
The Secretary of the Treasury, through participation 3
in the G7, and other appropriate fora, shall develop a strat-4
egy in coordination with United States allies and partners 5
to ensure that Hamas is incapable of financing armed hos-6
tilities against Israel. 7
SEC. 4. PROHIBITION ON USE OF THE EXCHANGE STA-8
BILIZATION FUND TO EXCHANGE SPECIAL 9
DRAWING RIGHTS OF, OR TO BENEFIT, STATE 10
SPONSORS OF TERRORISM. 11
Section 5302 of title 31, United States Code, is amend-12
ed by adding at the end the following: 13
‘‘(e) P
ROHIBITION ONUSE OFFUND TOEXCHANGE 14
S
PECIALDRAWINGRIGHTS OF, OR TOBENEFIT, ASTATE 15
S
PONSOR OFTERRORISM.—The Secretary may not use the 16
fund to— 17
‘‘(1) deal in Special Drawing Rights from any 18
country determined by the Secretary of State to have 19
repeatedly provided support for acts of international 20
terrorism, as designated pursuant to section 1754(c) 21
of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal 22
Year 2019, section 40 of the Arms Export Control 23
Act, or section 620A of the Foreign Assistance Act of 24
1961; or 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS 5 
•HR 6322 RH
‘‘(2) deal in Special Drawing Rights with any 1
other country in a manner that the Secretary finds 2
will result in the direct provision of funds to a coun-3
try referred to in paragraph (1).’’. 4
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6203 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS Union Calendar No. 
704 
118
TH
CONGRESS 
2
D
S
ESSION
 
H. R. 6322 
[Report No. 118–799, Part I] 
A BILL 
To evaluate and disrupt financing to Hamas, and 
to amend title 31, United States Code, to pro-
hibit the exchange stabilization fund from being 
used to deal in Special Drawing Rights from 
state sponsors of terrorism, and for other pur-
poses. 
D
ECEMBER
12, 2024 
Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged; committed to 
the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the 
Union and ordered to be printed 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:03 Dec 13, 2024 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6651 Sfmt 6651 E:\BILLS\H6322.RH H6322
DMWilson on DSKJM0X7X2PROD with BILLS