Senate
|
11/18/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 181 (Roll no. 464). (text: CR H5994)
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 198 - 206 (Roll no. 463).
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6000-6001)
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 7409, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Stansbury demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Ms. Stansbury moved to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources. (CR H5998)
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7409.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8932, H.R. 7409 and H.R. 8446. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 8932, H.R. 7409, and H.R. 8446 under a closed rule, and provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1568. (consideration: CR H5994-5998)
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1568 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 8932, H.R. 7409 and H.R. 8446. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 8932, H.R. 7409, and H.R. 8446 under a closed rule, and provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit on each bill.
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 609.
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2024
|
Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-722.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|