Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 352 - 65, 1 Present (Roll no. 86). (text: CR H1163-1164)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7521.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1163-1171)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Mrs. Rodgers (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 344.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-417.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce Discharged
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|