Executive
|
01/05/2025
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Became Public Law No: 118-273.
|
Action Code: E40000, Type: President
|
|
|
12/27/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Presented to President.
|
Action Code: E20000, Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/21/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
Action Code: , Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/20/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Motion by Senator Schumer to commit to Senate Committee on Finance with instructions to report back forthwith with the following amendment (SA 3357) made in Senate.
|
Action Code: , Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/19/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Measure laid before Senate by motion.
|
Action Code: , Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/18/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 73 - 27. Record Vote Number: 326.
|
Action Code: , Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/17/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
|
Action Code: H11000, Type: Committee
|
|
|
12/12/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S6980)
|
Action Code: , Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/11/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 693.
|
Action Code: , Type: Calendars
|
|
|
12/10/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
Action Code: , Type: Calendars
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Received in the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 327 - 75, 1 Present (Roll no. 456). (text: CR H5925)
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5944-5945)
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 82.
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5925-5931)
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Mr. Smith (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
UNANIMOUS CONSENT REQUEST - Mr. Harris asked unanimous consent that the order of the House on November 5, 2024, with respect to H.R. 82 be vacated. Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2024
|
UNANIMOUS CONSENT REQUEST - The Chair recongized Mr. Good (VA) for a unanimous consent request. Mr. Good (VA) asked unanimous consent that H.R. 82 be laid on the table. Without objection the unanimous consent request was agreed to.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|