Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 255 - 161 (Roll no. 454). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H5772)
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 212 (Roll no. 453).
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 8205, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Fitzgerald demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Mr. Cardenas moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. (CR H5775-5776)
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 8205.
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3334, H.R. 8205, H.R. 8790 and H. Res. 1469. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3334 and H.R. 8790 under a structured rule and H.R. 8205 and H. Res. 1469 under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 3334, H.R. 8790, and H.R. 8205.
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1486. (consideration: CR H5772-5776, H5803-5804)
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1486 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3334, H.R. 8205, H.R. 8790 and H. Res. 1469. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3334 and H.R. 8790 under a structured rule and H.R. 8205 and H. Res. 1469 under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 3334, H.R. 8790, and H.R. 8205.
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 598.
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2024
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 118-704.
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 14 - 9.
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|