House | 03/23/2023 | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-25, Part I. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 21. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 15 - 11 . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced in House |