Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HCR14 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/08/2023

                            IV 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. CON. RES. 14 
Expressing disapproval of the revocation by President Biden of the 
Presidential permit for the Keystone XL pipeline. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
FEBRUARY7, 2023 
Mrs. L
ESKO(for herself and Mr. BALDERSON) submitted the following concur-
rent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Transportation 
and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and 
Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently deter-
mined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions 
as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned 
CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 
Expressing disapproval of the revocation by President Biden 
of the Presidential permit for the Keystone XL pipeline. 
Whereas, on March 29, 2019, TransCanada Keystone Pipe-
line, L.P., was granted a Presidential permit to con-
struct, connect, operate, and maintain the Keystone XL 
pipeline; and 
Whereas, on January 20, 2021, President Biden issued Exec-
utive Order 13990 (86 Fed. Reg. 7037) that revoked the 
March 2019 Presidential permit for the Keystone XL 
pipeline: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate 1
concurring), That Congress disapproves of the revocation 2
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:58 Feb 08, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HC14.IH HC14
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HCON 14 IH 
by President Biden of the Presidential permit for the Key-1
stone XL pipeline. 2
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:58 Feb 08, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HC14.IH HC14
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB