House
|
04/10/2023
|
Became Public Law No: 118-3.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Signed by President.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 68 - 23. Record Vote Number: 80.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1028, S1043-1044)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 33.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee on Finance discharged pursuant to 50 U.S.C. 1622.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 197 (Roll no. 104). (consideration: CR H608)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H612-613)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 7, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Graves (MO) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 7.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 7, H.R. 139, H.R. 382 and H.R. 497. All bills are considered under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 75. (consideration: CR H607-611)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 75 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 7, H.R. 139, H.R. 382 and H.R. 497. All bills are considered under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|