Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR1219 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/11/2024

                            IV 
118THCONGRESS 
2
DSESSION H. RES. 1219 
Condemning the Biden Administration’s decision to pause certain arms 
transfers to Israel. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY10, 2024 
Mr. M
ILLERof Ohio (for himself and Mr. MCCAUL) submitted the following 
resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs 
RESOLUTION 
Condemning the Biden Administration’s decision to pause 
certain arms transfers to Israel. 
Whereas, on October 7, 2023, Hamas terrorists launched a 
massive, unprovoked war on Israel, killing over 1,200 in-
nocent people and taking over 240 hostages, including 
American citizens; 
Whereas since October 7, Israel has faced attacks by Iran 
and its proxies including Hezbollah, Hamas, and the 
Houthis, which have required significant military re-
sponses; 
Whereas under the terms of a 2016 Memorandum of Under-
standing, the United States provides Israel with $3.8 bil-
lion per year in security assistance and missile defense 
funding from fiscal years 2019 through 2028, which is 
subject to the approval of Congress; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:19 May 11, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR1219.IH HR1219
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 1219 IH 
Whereas thus far in fiscal year 2024, Congress has enacted 
regular and supplemental legislation appropriating $12.5 
billion in security assistance and missile defense for 
Israel without any additional conditions; 
Whereas Congress plays a vital role in oversight and approval 
of direct commercial sales and foreign military sales to 
security partners around the world, including Israel; 
Whereas, in May 2024, it was reported that President Biden 
ordered a pause on certain defense articles ready for im-
minent delivery to Israel, without having consulted with 
Congress; and 
Whereas, on May 8, 2024, President Biden stated regarding 
Israel, ‘‘We’re not going to supply the weapons and artil-
lery shells.’’: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) condemns the Biden Administration’s deci-2
sion to pause certain arms transfers to Israel as 3
Israel faces unprecedented threats from Iran and its 4
proxies including Hezbollah, Hamas, and the 5
Houthis; 6
(2) calls on the Biden Administration to allow 7
all previously approved arms transfers to Israel to 8
proceed quickly to ensure that Israel can defend 9
itself and defeat threats from Iran and its proxies 10
including Hezbollah, Hamas, and the Houthis; 11
(3) calls on the Biden Administration to utilize 12
all congressionally appropriated funds for security 13
assistance for Israel as Congress intended; 14
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:19 May 11, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR1219.IH HR1219
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HRES 1219 IH 
(4) stands with Israel as it defends itself 1
against the barbaric war launched by Hamas and 2
other terrorists; and 3
(5) reaffirms Israel’s right to self-defense. 4
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:19 May 11, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR1219.IH HR1219
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS