1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 394 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Expressing support for the 60th anniversary of the Polaris Sales Agreement |
---|
6 | 6 | | between the United States and the United Kingdom of Great Britain |
---|
7 | 7 | | and Northern Ireland. |
---|
8 | 8 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
9 | 9 | | MAY11, 2023 |
---|
10 | 10 | | Mr. L |
---|
11 | 11 | | AMBORN(for himself and Mr. MOULTON) submitted the following |
---|
12 | 12 | | resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs |
---|
13 | 13 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
14 | 14 | | Expressing support for the 60th anniversary of the Polaris |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sales Agreement between the United States and the |
---|
16 | 16 | | United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland. |
---|
17 | 17 | | Whereas President Kennedy and Prime Minister MacMillan |
---|
18 | 18 | | met in Nassau, the Commonwealth of the Bahamas, and |
---|
19 | 19 | | issued a ‘‘Statement on Nuclear Defense Systems’’ on |
---|
20 | 20 | | December 21, 1962, agreeing that the United States will |
---|
21 | 21 | | make available on a continuing basis Polaris missiles for |
---|
22 | 22 | | British submarines; |
---|
23 | 23 | | Whereas the Secretary of State Dean Rusk and British Am- |
---|
24 | 24 | | bassador to the United States David Ormsby-Gore signed |
---|
25 | 25 | | the Polaris Sales Agreement on April 6, 1963, in Wash- |
---|
26 | 26 | | ington, DC, reaffirming the ‘‘Statement on Nuclear De- |
---|
27 | 27 | | fense Systems’’ and agreeing that the Government of the |
---|
28 | 28 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:57 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR394.IH HR394 |
---|
29 | 29 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
30 | 30 | | •HRES 394 IH |
---|
31 | 31 | | United States shall provide and the Government of the |
---|
32 | 32 | | United Kingdom shall purchase from the Government of |
---|
33 | 33 | | the United States Polaris missiles (less warheads), equip- |
---|
34 | 34 | | ment, and supporting services; |
---|
35 | 35 | | Whereas the H.M.S. Resolution launched the first United |
---|
36 | 36 | | Kingdom’s Polaris missile on February 15, 1968, and in |
---|
37 | 37 | | 1969, commenced the first strategic deterrent patrol for |
---|
38 | 38 | | the United Kingdom, beginning a Continuous At-Sea De- |
---|
39 | 39 | | terrent for the United Kingdom that remains unbroken |
---|
40 | 40 | | to this day; |
---|
41 | 41 | | Whereas the Polaris Sales Agreement was amended for the |
---|
42 | 42 | | UGM–133 Trident II (D5) strategic weapon system on |
---|
43 | 43 | | October 19, 1982, in Washington, DC, through an ex- |
---|
44 | 44 | | change of notes between the Secretary of State Jonathan |
---|
45 | 45 | | Howe and the British Ambassador to the United States |
---|
46 | 46 | | Oliver Wright; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | Whereas the United States and the United Kingdom agreed |
---|
48 | 48 | | to continue cooperation under the auspices of the Polaris |
---|
49 | 49 | | Sales Agreement, to design a common missile compart- |
---|
50 | 50 | | ment for both nations follow-on ballistic missile sub- |
---|
51 | 51 | | marines through an exchange of letters in 2008 between |
---|
52 | 52 | | the Secretary of Defense the Honorable Robert Oates |
---|
53 | 53 | | and the United Kingdom Secretary of State for Defence |
---|
54 | 54 | | the Right Honorable Desmond Browne: Now, therefore, |
---|
55 | 55 | | be it |
---|
56 | 56 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (1) marks the 60th anniversary of the Polaris 2 |
---|
58 | 58 | | Sales Agreement between the United States and the 3 |
---|
59 | 59 | | United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ire-4 |
---|
60 | 60 | | land; 5 |
---|
61 | 61 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:57 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR394.IH HR394 |
---|
62 | 62 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 |
---|
63 | 63 | | •HRES 394 IH |
---|
64 | 64 | | (2) congratulates the Royal Navy for stead-1 |
---|
65 | 65 | | fastly maintaining a Continuous At-Sea Deterrent; 2 |
---|
66 | 66 | | (3) recognizes the important contribution of the 3 |
---|
67 | 67 | | United Kingdom deterrent to the North Atlantic 4 |
---|
68 | 68 | | Treaty Organization; 5 |
---|
69 | 69 | | (4) reaffirms the United Kingdom is a valued 6 |
---|
70 | 70 | | and special ally; and 7 |
---|
71 | 71 | | (5) looks forward to continuing and strength-8 |
---|
72 | 72 | | ening our shared commitment to sustain our sub-9 |
---|
73 | 73 | | marine-based strategic deterrents well into the fu-10 |
---|
74 | 74 | | ture. 11 |
---|
75 | 75 | | Æ |
---|
76 | 76 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:57 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR394.IH HR394 |
---|
77 | 77 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB |
---|