Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR394 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/12/2023

                            IV 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 394 
Expressing support for the 60th anniversary of the Polaris Sales Agreement 
between the United States and the United Kingdom of Great Britain 
and Northern Ireland. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY11, 2023 
Mr. L
AMBORN(for himself and Mr. MOULTON) submitted the following 
resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs 
RESOLUTION 
Expressing support for the 60th anniversary of the Polaris 
Sales Agreement between the United States and the 
United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland. 
Whereas President Kennedy and Prime Minister MacMillan 
met in Nassau, the Commonwealth of the Bahamas, and 
issued a ‘‘Statement on Nuclear Defense Systems’’ on 
December 21, 1962, agreeing that the United States will 
make available on a continuing basis Polaris missiles for 
British submarines; 
Whereas the Secretary of State Dean Rusk and British Am-
bassador to the United States David Ormsby-Gore signed 
the Polaris Sales Agreement on April 6, 1963, in Wash-
ington, DC, reaffirming the ‘‘Statement on Nuclear De-
fense Systems’’ and agreeing that the Government of the 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:57 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR394.IH HR394
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 394 IH 
United States shall provide and the Government of the 
United Kingdom shall purchase from the Government of 
the United States Polaris missiles (less warheads), equip-
ment, and supporting services; 
Whereas the H.M.S. Resolution launched the first United 
Kingdom’s Polaris missile on February 15, 1968, and in 
1969, commenced the first strategic deterrent patrol for 
the United Kingdom, beginning a Continuous At-Sea De-
terrent for the United Kingdom that remains unbroken 
to this day; 
Whereas the Polaris Sales Agreement was amended for the 
UGM–133 Trident II (D5) strategic weapon system on 
October 19, 1982, in Washington, DC, through an ex-
change of notes between the Secretary of State Jonathan 
Howe and the British Ambassador to the United States 
Oliver Wright; and 
Whereas the United States and the United Kingdom agreed 
to continue cooperation under the auspices of the Polaris 
Sales Agreement, to design a common missile compart-
ment for both nations follow-on ballistic missile sub-
marines through an exchange of letters in 2008 between 
the Secretary of Defense the Honorable Robert Oates 
and the United Kingdom Secretary of State for Defence 
the Right Honorable Desmond Browne: Now, therefore, 
be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) marks the 60th anniversary of the Polaris 2
Sales Agreement between the United States and the 3
United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ire-4
land; 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:57 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR394.IH HR394
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HRES 394 IH 
(2) congratulates the Royal Navy for stead-1
fastly maintaining a Continuous At-Sea Deterrent; 2
(3) recognizes the important contribution of the 3
United Kingdom deterrent to the North Atlantic 4
Treaty Organization; 5
(4) reaffirms the United Kingdom is a valued 6
and special ally; and 7
(5) looks forward to continuing and strength-8
ening our shared commitment to sustain our sub-9
marine-based strategic deterrents well into the fu-10
ture. 11
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:57 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR394.IH HR394
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB