House
|
03/21/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 200 (Roll no. 96). (text: CR H1314)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The previous question was ordered on the resolution and preamble pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 987.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, H. Res. 987 and H.R. 7023. The resolution provides for consideration H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, and H. Res. 987 under a closed rule, and H.R. 7023 under a structured rule, each with one hour of general debate. The rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, and H.R. 7023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1085. (consideration: CR H1314-1321)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1085 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, H. Res. 98and H.R. 7023. The resolution provides for consideration H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, and H. Res. 987 under a closed rule, and H.R. 7023 under a structured rule, each with one hour of general debate. The rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, and H.R. 7023.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Rule H. Res. 994 failed passage of House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 994 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7160 and H. Res. 987. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 7160 and H. Res. 987 under a closed rule with one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on H.R. 7160.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|