Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Became Public Law No: 118-43.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Signed by President.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: 03/05/2024 CR H788)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1025)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Green (TN) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 206.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H788-789)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Mr. Green (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Held at the desk.
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Received in the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2252; text: CR S2252)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 44.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 118-16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|