Senate | 07/18/2023 | Became Public Law No: 118-8. | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Signed by President. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Presented to President. | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2975) | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 30. | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2975-2976) | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Mr. Bost moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held at the desk. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Received in the House. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S874-875; text: CR S875) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 24. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |