Senate | 01/26/2024 | Became Public Law No: 118-36. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Signed by President. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Presented to President. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H229-230) | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Mr. Steil asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H229-230) | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Held at the desk. | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Received in the House. | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |