Executive
|
12/17/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Became Public Law No: 118-152.
|
Action Code: E40000, Type: President
|
|
|
12/12/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Presented to President.
|
Action Code: E20000, Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/09/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
Action Code: H38310, Type: Floor
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Held at the desk.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Received in the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2371)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
S.Amdt.1694 Amendment SA 1694 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S2371) In the nature of a substitute.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
S.Amdt.1694 Amendment SA 1694 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2371)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
|
|
|