Us Congress 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR207 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/12/2023

                    III 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. RES. 207 
Marking the 60th anniversary of the Polaris Sales Agreement between the 
United States and the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern 
Ireland. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
MAY11, 2023 
Mrs. F
ISCHER(for herself and Mr. KING) submitted the following resolution; 
which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations 
RESOLUTION 
Marking the 60th anniversary of the Polaris Sales Agreement 
between the United States and the United Kingdom of 
Great Britain and Northern Ireland. 
Whereas, on December 21, 1962, President John F. Kennedy 
and Prime Minister of the United Kingdom Harold Mac-
millan met in Nassau, Bahamas, and issued a joint state-
ment (commonly referred to as the ‘‘Statement on Nu-
clear Defense Systems’’), agreeing that the United States 
would make Polaris missiles available on a continuing 
basis to the United Kingdom for use in submarines; 
Whereas, on April 6, 1963, Secretary of State Dean Rusk 
and Her Majesty’s Ambassador to the United States 
David Ormsby-Gore signed the Polaris Sales Agreement, 
reaffirming the Statement on Nuclear Defense Systems 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•SRES 207 IS 
and agreeing that the United States Government shall 
provide and the Government of the United Kingdom shall 
purchase from the United States Government Polaris 
missiles, equipment, and supporting services; 
Whereas the HMS Resolution launched the first Polaris mis-
sile of the United Kingdom on February 15, 1968, and, 
in 1969, commenced the first strategic deterrent patrol 
for the United Kingdom, initiating a continuous at-sea 
deterrent posture for the United Kingdom that remains 
in effect; 
Whereas the Polaris Sales Agreement was amended to in-
clude the Trident II (D5) strategic weapon system on Oc-
tober 19, 1982, in Washington, DC, through an exchange 
of notes between Secretary of State Jonathan Howe and 
Her Majesty’s Ambassador to the United States Oliver 
Wright; and 
Whereas through an exchange of letters in 2008 between Sec-
retary of Defense the Honorable Robert Gates and Sec-
retary of State for Defence of the United Kingdom the 
Right Honorable Desmond Browne and under the aus-
pices of the Polaris Sales Agreement, the United States 
Government and the Government of the United Kingdom 
agreed to continue cooperation to design a common mis-
sile compartment for the follow-on ballistic missile sub-
marines of each nation: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the Senate— 1
(1) marks the 60th anniversary of the Polaris 2
Sales Agreement between the Government of the 3
United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ire-4
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•SRES 207 IS 
land and the Government of the United States of 1
America, done at Washington April 6, 1963; 2
(2) congratulates the Royal Navy for stead-3
fastly maintaining a Continuous At-Sea Deterrent; 4
(3) recognizes the important contribution of the 5
Continuous At-Sea Deterrent to the North Atlantic 6
Treaty Organization; 7
(4) reaffirms that the United Kingdom is a val-8
ued and special ally of the United States; and 9
(5) looks forward to continuing and strength-10
ening the shared commitment of the United States 11
and the United Kingdom to sustain submarine-based 12
strategic deterrents well into the future. 13
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB