III 118THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION S. RES. 207 Marking the 60th anniversary of the Polaris Sales Agreement between the United States and the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland. IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES MAY11, 2023 Mrs. F ISCHER(for herself and Mr. KING) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations RESOLUTION Marking the 60th anniversary of the Polaris Sales Agreement between the United States and the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland. Whereas, on December 21, 1962, President John F. Kennedy and Prime Minister of the United Kingdom Harold Mac- millan met in Nassau, Bahamas, and issued a joint state- ment (commonly referred to as the ‘‘Statement on Nu- clear Defense Systems’’), agreeing that the United States would make Polaris missiles available on a continuing basis to the United Kingdom for use in submarines; Whereas, on April 6, 1963, Secretary of State Dean Rusk and Her Majesty’s Ambassador to the United States David Ormsby-Gore signed the Polaris Sales Agreement, reaffirming the Statement on Nuclear Defense Systems VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207 pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 •SRES 207 IS and agreeing that the United States Government shall provide and the Government of the United Kingdom shall purchase from the United States Government Polaris missiles, equipment, and supporting services; Whereas the HMS Resolution launched the first Polaris mis- sile of the United Kingdom on February 15, 1968, and, in 1969, commenced the first strategic deterrent patrol for the United Kingdom, initiating a continuous at-sea deterrent posture for the United Kingdom that remains in effect; Whereas the Polaris Sales Agreement was amended to in- clude the Trident II (D5) strategic weapon system on Oc- tober 19, 1982, in Washington, DC, through an exchange of notes between Secretary of State Jonathan Howe and Her Majesty’s Ambassador to the United States Oliver Wright; and Whereas through an exchange of letters in 2008 between Sec- retary of Defense the Honorable Robert Gates and Sec- retary of State for Defence of the United Kingdom the Right Honorable Desmond Browne and under the aus- pices of the Polaris Sales Agreement, the United States Government and the Government of the United Kingdom agreed to continue cooperation to design a common mis- sile compartment for the follow-on ballistic missile sub- marines of each nation: Now, therefore, be it Resolved, That the Senate— 1 (1) marks the 60th anniversary of the Polaris 2 Sales Agreement between the Government of the 3 United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ire-4 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207 pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 •SRES 207 IS land and the Government of the United States of 1 America, done at Washington April 6, 1963; 2 (2) congratulates the Royal Navy for stead-3 fastly maintaining a Continuous At-Sea Deterrent; 4 (3) recognizes the important contribution of the 5 Continuous At-Sea Deterrent to the North Atlantic 6 Treaty Organization; 7 (4) reaffirms that the United Kingdom is a val-8 ued and special ally of the United States; and 9 (5) looks forward to continuing and strength-10 ening the shared commitment of the United States 11 and the United Kingdom to sustain submarine-based 12 strategic deterrents well into the future. 13 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207 pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB