1 | 1 | | III |
---|
2 | 2 | | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION S. RES. 207 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Marking the 60th anniversary of the Polaris Sales Agreement between the |
---|
6 | 6 | | United States and the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern |
---|
7 | 7 | | Ireland. |
---|
8 | 8 | | IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES |
---|
9 | 9 | | MAY11, 2023 |
---|
10 | 10 | | Mrs. F |
---|
11 | 11 | | ISCHER(for herself and Mr. KING) submitted the following resolution; |
---|
12 | 12 | | which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations |
---|
13 | 13 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
14 | 14 | | Marking the 60th anniversary of the Polaris Sales Agreement |
---|
15 | 15 | | between the United States and the United Kingdom of |
---|
16 | 16 | | Great Britain and Northern Ireland. |
---|
17 | 17 | | Whereas, on December 21, 1962, President John F. Kennedy |
---|
18 | 18 | | and Prime Minister of the United Kingdom Harold Mac- |
---|
19 | 19 | | millan met in Nassau, Bahamas, and issued a joint state- |
---|
20 | 20 | | ment (commonly referred to as the ‘‘Statement on Nu- |
---|
21 | 21 | | clear Defense Systems’’), agreeing that the United States |
---|
22 | 22 | | would make Polaris missiles available on a continuing |
---|
23 | 23 | | basis to the United Kingdom for use in submarines; |
---|
24 | 24 | | Whereas, on April 6, 1963, Secretary of State Dean Rusk |
---|
25 | 25 | | and Her Majesty’s Ambassador to the United States |
---|
26 | 26 | | David Ormsby-Gore signed the Polaris Sales Agreement, |
---|
27 | 27 | | reaffirming the Statement on Nuclear Defense Systems |
---|
28 | 28 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207 |
---|
29 | 29 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
30 | 30 | | •SRES 207 IS |
---|
31 | 31 | | and agreeing that the United States Government shall |
---|
32 | 32 | | provide and the Government of the United Kingdom shall |
---|
33 | 33 | | purchase from the United States Government Polaris |
---|
34 | 34 | | missiles, equipment, and supporting services; |
---|
35 | 35 | | Whereas the HMS Resolution launched the first Polaris mis- |
---|
36 | 36 | | sile of the United Kingdom on February 15, 1968, and, |
---|
37 | 37 | | in 1969, commenced the first strategic deterrent patrol |
---|
38 | 38 | | for the United Kingdom, initiating a continuous at-sea |
---|
39 | 39 | | deterrent posture for the United Kingdom that remains |
---|
40 | 40 | | in effect; |
---|
41 | 41 | | Whereas the Polaris Sales Agreement was amended to in- |
---|
42 | 42 | | clude the Trident II (D5) strategic weapon system on Oc- |
---|
43 | 43 | | tober 19, 1982, in Washington, DC, through an exchange |
---|
44 | 44 | | of notes between Secretary of State Jonathan Howe and |
---|
45 | 45 | | Her Majesty’s Ambassador to the United States Oliver |
---|
46 | 46 | | Wright; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | Whereas through an exchange of letters in 2008 between Sec- |
---|
48 | 48 | | retary of Defense the Honorable Robert Gates and Sec- |
---|
49 | 49 | | retary of State for Defence of the United Kingdom the |
---|
50 | 50 | | Right Honorable Desmond Browne and under the aus- |
---|
51 | 51 | | pices of the Polaris Sales Agreement, the United States |
---|
52 | 52 | | Government and the Government of the United Kingdom |
---|
53 | 53 | | agreed to continue cooperation to design a common mis- |
---|
54 | 54 | | sile compartment for the follow-on ballistic missile sub- |
---|
55 | 55 | | marines of each nation: Now, therefore, be it |
---|
56 | 56 | | Resolved, That the Senate— 1 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (1) marks the 60th anniversary of the Polaris 2 |
---|
58 | 58 | | Sales Agreement between the Government of the 3 |
---|
59 | 59 | | United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ire-4 |
---|
60 | 60 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207 |
---|
61 | 61 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 |
---|
62 | 62 | | •SRES 207 IS |
---|
63 | 63 | | land and the Government of the United States of 1 |
---|
64 | 64 | | America, done at Washington April 6, 1963; 2 |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) congratulates the Royal Navy for stead-3 |
---|
66 | 66 | | fastly maintaining a Continuous At-Sea Deterrent; 4 |
---|
67 | 67 | | (3) recognizes the important contribution of the 5 |
---|
68 | 68 | | Continuous At-Sea Deterrent to the North Atlantic 6 |
---|
69 | 69 | | Treaty Organization; 7 |
---|
70 | 70 | | (4) reaffirms that the United Kingdom is a val-8 |
---|
71 | 71 | | ued and special ally of the United States; and 9 |
---|
72 | 72 | | (5) looks forward to continuing and strength-10 |
---|
73 | 73 | | ening the shared commitment of the United States 11 |
---|
74 | 74 | | and the United Kingdom to sustain submarine-based 12 |
---|
75 | 75 | | strategic deterrents well into the future. 13 |
---|
76 | 76 | | Æ |
---|
77 | 77 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:54 May 12, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR207.IS SR207 |
---|
78 | 78 | | pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB |
---|