1 | 1 | | I |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. R. 1720 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend certain telehealth |
---|
6 | 6 | | flexibilities with respect to hospice care under the Medicare program, |
---|
7 | 7 | | and to establish a modifier for recertifications of hospice care eligibility |
---|
8 | 8 | | conducted through telehealth. |
---|
9 | 9 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
10 | 10 | | FEBRUARY27, 2025 |
---|
11 | 11 | | Mrs. M |
---|
12 | 12 | | ILLERof West Virginia (for herself, Mr. GOLDENof Maine, Ms. VAN |
---|
13 | 13 | | D |
---|
14 | 14 | | UYNE, Mr. DAVISof North Carolina, Mr. BEANof Florida, and Mr. |
---|
15 | 15 | | M |
---|
16 | 16 | | ORELLE) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Com- |
---|
17 | 17 | | mittee on Ways and Means |
---|
18 | 18 | | A BILL |
---|
19 | 19 | | To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend |
---|
20 | 20 | | certain telehealth flexibilities with respect to hospice care |
---|
21 | 21 | | under the Medicare program, and to establish a modifier |
---|
22 | 22 | | for recertifications of hospice care eligibility conducted |
---|
23 | 23 | | through telehealth. |
---|
24 | 24 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Hospice Recertification 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Flexibility Act’’. 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 08:16 Mar 19, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1720.IH H1720 |
---|
30 | 30 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | •HR 1720 IH |
---|
32 | 32 | | SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF CERTAIN TELEHEALTH FLEXIBILI-1 |
---|
33 | 33 | | TIES. 2 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Section 1814(a)(7)(D)(i)(II) of the Social Security 3 |
---|
35 | 35 | | Act (42 U.S.C. 1395f(a)(7)(D)(i)(II)) is amended— 4 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (1) by striking ‘‘ending on March 31, 2025’’ 5 |
---|
37 | 37 | | and inserting ‘‘ending on December 31, 2027’’; and 6 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) by inserting ‘‘, except that this subclause 7 |
---|
39 | 39 | | shall not apply in the case of such an encounter with 8 |
---|
40 | 40 | | an individual occurring on or after January 1, 2026, 9 |
---|
41 | 41 | | if such individual is located in an area that has been 10 |
---|
42 | 42 | | subject to a moratorium on the enrollment of hos-11 |
---|
43 | 43 | | pice programs under this title pursuant to section 12 |
---|
44 | 44 | | 1866(j)(7) for a period of not less than 6 months, 13 |
---|
45 | 45 | | if such individual is receiving hospice care from a 14 |
---|
46 | 46 | | provider that is subject to enhanced oversight under 15 |
---|
47 | 47 | | this title pursuant to section 1866(j)(3), or if such 16 |
---|
48 | 48 | | encounter is performed by a hospice physician or 17 |
---|
49 | 49 | | nurse practitioner who is not enrolled under section 18 |
---|
50 | 50 | | 1866(j) and is not an opt-out physician or practi-19 |
---|
51 | 51 | | tioner (as defined in section 1802(b)(6)(D))’’ before 20 |
---|
52 | 52 | | the semicolon. 21 |
---|
53 | 53 | | SEC. 3. ESTABLISHMENT OF MODIFIER FOR RECERTIFI-22 |
---|
54 | 54 | | CATIONS OF HOSPICE CARE ELIGIBILITY 23 |
---|
55 | 55 | | CONDUCTED THROUGH TELEHEALTH. 24 |
---|
56 | 56 | | Section 1814(a)(7)(D)(i)(II) of the Social Security 25 |
---|
57 | 57 | | Act (42 U.S.C. 1395f(a)(7)(D)(i)(II)), as amended by sec-26 |
---|
58 | 58 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 08:16 Mar 19, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1720.IH H1720 |
---|
59 | 59 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 |
---|
60 | 60 | | •HR 1720 IH |
---|
61 | 61 | | tion 2, is further amended by inserting ‘‘, but only if, in 1 |
---|
62 | 62 | | the case of such an encounter occurring on or after Janu-2 |
---|
63 | 63 | | ary 1, 2026, any hospice claim includes 1 or more modi-3 |
---|
64 | 64 | | fiers or codes (as specified by the Secretary) to indicate 4 |
---|
65 | 65 | | that such encounter was conducted via telehealth’’ after 5 |
---|
66 | 66 | | ‘‘as determined appropriate by the Secretary’’. 6 |
---|
67 | 67 | | Æ |
---|
68 | 68 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 08:16 Mar 19, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H1720.IH H1720 |
---|
69 | 69 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|