Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB1720 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/19/2025

                            I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 1720 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend certain telehealth 
flexibilities with respect to hospice care under the Medicare program, 
and to establish a modifier for recertifications of hospice care eligibility 
conducted through telehealth. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
FEBRUARY27, 2025 
Mrs. M
ILLERof West Virginia (for herself, Mr. GOLDENof Maine, Ms. VAN 
D
UYNE, Mr. DAVISof North Carolina, Mr. BEANof Florida, and Mr. 
M
ORELLE) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Com-
mittee on Ways and Means 
A BILL 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend 
certain telehealth flexibilities with respect to hospice care 
under the Medicare program, and to establish a modifier 
for recertifications of hospice care eligibility conducted 
through telehealth. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Hospice Recertification 4
Flexibility Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 08:16 Mar 19, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1720.IH H1720
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 1720 IH
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF CERTAIN TELEHEALTH FLEXIBILI-1
TIES. 2
Section 1814(a)(7)(D)(i)(II) of the Social Security 3
Act (42 U.S.C. 1395f(a)(7)(D)(i)(II)) is amended— 4
(1) by striking ‘‘ending on March 31, 2025’’ 5
and inserting ‘‘ending on December 31, 2027’’; and 6
(2) by inserting ‘‘, except that this subclause 7
shall not apply in the case of such an encounter with 8
an individual occurring on or after January 1, 2026, 9
if such individual is located in an area that has been 10
subject to a moratorium on the enrollment of hos-11
pice programs under this title pursuant to section 12
1866(j)(7) for a period of not less than 6 months, 13
if such individual is receiving hospice care from a 14
provider that is subject to enhanced oversight under 15
this title pursuant to section 1866(j)(3), or if such 16
encounter is performed by a hospice physician or 17
nurse practitioner who is not enrolled under section 18
1866(j) and is not an opt-out physician or practi-19
tioner (as defined in section 1802(b)(6)(D))’’ before 20
the semicolon. 21
SEC. 3. ESTABLISHMENT OF MODIFIER FOR RECERTIFI-22
CATIONS OF HOSPICE CARE ELIGIBILITY 23
CONDUCTED THROUGH TELEHEALTH. 24
Section 1814(a)(7)(D)(i)(II) of the Social Security 25
Act (42 U.S.C. 1395f(a)(7)(D)(i)(II)), as amended by sec-26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 08:16 Mar 19, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1720.IH H1720
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 1720 IH
tion 2, is further amended by inserting ‘‘, but only if, in 1
the case of such an encounter occurring on or after Janu-2
ary 1, 2026, any hospice claim includes 1 or more modi-3
fiers or codes (as specified by the Secretary) to indicate 4
that such encounter was conducted via telehealth’’ after 5
‘‘as determined appropriate by the Secretary’’. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 08:16 Mar 19, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H1720.IH H1720
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB