1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 285 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Condemning the wave of domestic terrorism attacks targeting Tesla cars |
---|
6 | 6 | | and dealerships. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | APRIL1, 2025 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Ms. B |
---|
10 | 10 | | OEBERT(for herself, Mr. NEHLS, Mr. OGLES, Mr. STEUBE, Ms. MACE, |
---|
11 | 11 | | Mr. B |
---|
12 | 12 | | IGGSof Arizona, Mr. GILLof Texas, Mr. MOOREof Alabama, Mr. |
---|
13 | 13 | | D |
---|
14 | 14 | | ONALDS, and Mrs. LUNA) submitted the following resolution; which was |
---|
15 | 15 | | referred to the Committee on the Judiciary |
---|
16 | 16 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
17 | 17 | | Condemning the wave of domestic terrorism attacks targeting |
---|
18 | 18 | | Tesla cars and dealerships. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Whereas members of the Democratic Party have made calls |
---|
20 | 20 | | for their supporters to incite and engage in domestic ter- |
---|
21 | 21 | | rorism by attacking Tesla vehicles and facilities to pro- |
---|
22 | 22 | | test Elon Musk; |
---|
23 | 23 | | Whereas anti-Tesla incidents have happened in at least 9 |
---|
24 | 24 | | States involving arson, gunfire, and vandalism; |
---|
25 | 25 | | Whereas at least 80 reported cases of vandalism or arson of |
---|
26 | 26 | | Tesla vehicles have taken place throughout the United |
---|
27 | 27 | | States and Canada; |
---|
28 | 28 | | Whereas at least 10 Tesla dealerships, charging stations, and |
---|
29 | 29 | | facilities have been hit by vandals; |
---|
30 | 30 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR285.IH HR285 |
---|
31 | 31 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
32 | 32 | | •HRES 285 IH |
---|
33 | 33 | | Whereas, on February 11, 2025, in Loveland, Colorado, a |
---|
34 | 34 | | man attacked a Tesla dealer on multiple occasions, in- |
---|
35 | 35 | | cluding throwing Molotov cocktails and spray-painting |
---|
36 | 36 | | words on vehicles and windows, including the word |
---|
37 | 37 | | ‘‘Nazi’’; |
---|
38 | 38 | | Whereas, on March 2, 2025, in Washington, DC, 2 people de- |
---|
39 | 39 | | faced Tesla vehicles, twice writing political hate speech on |
---|
40 | 40 | | the vehicles before fleeing; |
---|
41 | 41 | | Whereas, on March 3, 2025, in Boston, Massachusetts, 7 |
---|
42 | 42 | | Tesla charging stations in a mall outside the Massachu- |
---|
43 | 43 | | setts capital were set on fire; |
---|
44 | 44 | | Whereas, on March 6, 2025, in Portland, Oregon, at least 7 |
---|
45 | 45 | | gunshots were fired into a Tesla showroom in the middle |
---|
46 | 46 | | of the night, windows were shattered, and 3 cars were |
---|
47 | 47 | | damaged, and 1 bullet went through an office wall and |
---|
48 | 48 | | into a computer monitor; |
---|
49 | 49 | | Whereas, on March 7, 2025, in North Charleston, South |
---|
50 | 50 | | Carolina, a 24-year-old man threw 5 Molotov cocktails at |
---|
51 | 51 | | a Tesla charging station, and witnesses reported seeing |
---|
52 | 52 | | a man spray-paint an expletive against Trump and |
---|
53 | 53 | | ‘‘Long Live Ukraine’’ in red paint in the parking lot; |
---|
54 | 54 | | Whereas, on March 7, 2025, in Loveland, Colorado, a man |
---|
55 | 55 | | ignited an incendiary device and hurled it at a Tesla |
---|
56 | 56 | | dealership, which landed between 2 cars and created a |
---|
57 | 57 | | fire that put lives at risk, and rocks were also thrown, |
---|
58 | 58 | | damaging both the building and multiple vehicles; |
---|
59 | 59 | | Whereas, on March 18, 2025, in Las Vegas, Nevada, a per- |
---|
60 | 60 | | son dressed in black shot at Tesla cars at a repair shop |
---|
61 | 61 | | and ignited 2 of them with Molotov cocktails, and the |
---|
62 | 62 | | word ‘‘Resist’’ was spray-painted on the front doors of |
---|
63 | 63 | | the shop; |
---|
64 | 64 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR285.IH HR285 |
---|
65 | 65 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 |
---|
66 | 66 | | •HRES 285 IH |
---|
67 | 67 | | Whereas, on March 24, 2025, the Austin police discovered |
---|
68 | 68 | | multiple incendiary devices that had been placed at a |
---|
69 | 69 | | Tesla showroom in Austin, Texas; and |
---|
70 | 70 | | Whereas, on March 24, 2025, the Federal Bureau of Inves- |
---|
71 | 71 | | tigation created a task force to work in conjunction with |
---|
72 | 72 | | the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives |
---|
73 | 73 | | to investigate violent Tesla attacks: Now, therefore, be it |
---|
74 | 74 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives con-1 |
---|
75 | 75 | | demns the wave of domestic terrorism attacks targeting 2 |
---|
76 | 76 | | Tesla cars and dealerships. 3 |
---|
77 | 77 | | Æ |
---|
78 | 78 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR285.IH HR285 |
---|
79 | 79 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|