Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR285 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/02/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 285 
Condemning the wave of domestic terrorism attacks targeting Tesla cars 
and dealerships. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL1, 2025 
Ms. B
OEBERT(for herself, Mr. NEHLS, Mr. OGLES, Mr. STEUBE, Ms. MACE, 
Mr. B
IGGSof Arizona, Mr. GILLof Texas, Mr. MOOREof Alabama, Mr. 
D
ONALDS, and Mrs. LUNA) submitted the following resolution; which was 
referred to the Committee on the Judiciary 
RESOLUTION 
Condemning the wave of domestic terrorism attacks targeting 
Tesla cars and dealerships. 
Whereas members of the Democratic Party have made calls 
for their supporters to incite and engage in domestic ter-
rorism by attacking Tesla vehicles and facilities to pro-
test Elon Musk; 
Whereas anti-Tesla incidents have happened in at least 9 
States involving arson, gunfire, and vandalism; 
Whereas at least 80 reported cases of vandalism or arson of 
Tesla vehicles have taken place throughout the United 
States and Canada; 
Whereas at least 10 Tesla dealerships, charging stations, and 
facilities have been hit by vandals; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR285.IH HR285
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 285 IH 
Whereas, on February 11, 2025, in Loveland, Colorado, a 
man attacked a Tesla dealer on multiple occasions, in-
cluding throwing Molotov cocktails and spray-painting 
words on vehicles and windows, including the word 
‘‘Nazi’’; 
Whereas, on March 2, 2025, in Washington, DC, 2 people de-
faced Tesla vehicles, twice writing political hate speech on 
the vehicles before fleeing; 
Whereas, on March 3, 2025, in Boston, Massachusetts, 7 
Tesla charging stations in a mall outside the Massachu-
setts capital were set on fire; 
Whereas, on March 6, 2025, in Portland, Oregon, at least 7 
gunshots were fired into a Tesla showroom in the middle 
of the night, windows were shattered, and 3 cars were 
damaged, and 1 bullet went through an office wall and 
into a computer monitor; 
Whereas, on March 7, 2025, in North Charleston, South 
Carolina, a 24-year-old man threw 5 Molotov cocktails at 
a Tesla charging station, and witnesses reported seeing 
a man spray-paint an expletive against Trump and 
‘‘Long Live Ukraine’’ in red paint in the parking lot; 
Whereas, on March 7, 2025, in Loveland, Colorado, a man 
ignited an incendiary device and hurled it at a Tesla 
dealership, which landed between 2 cars and created a 
fire that put lives at risk, and rocks were also thrown, 
damaging both the building and multiple vehicles; 
Whereas, on March 18, 2025, in Las Vegas, Nevada, a per-
son dressed in black shot at Tesla cars at a repair shop 
and ignited 2 of them with Molotov cocktails, and the 
word ‘‘Resist’’ was spray-painted on the front doors of 
the shop; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR285.IH HR285
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HRES 285 IH 
Whereas, on March 24, 2025, the Austin police discovered 
multiple incendiary devices that had been placed at a 
Tesla showroom in Austin, Texas; and 
Whereas, on March 24, 2025, the Federal Bureau of Inves-
tigation created a task force to work in conjunction with 
the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives 
to investigate violent Tesla attacks: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives con-1
demns the wave of domestic terrorism attacks targeting 2
Tesla cars and dealerships. 3
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:00 Apr 02, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR285.IH HR285
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS