Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR295 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/08/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 295 
Expressing Support for the President’s Actions to Safeguard National 
Security and Eliminate Threats from Foreign Terrorist Organizations. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL7, 2025 
Mr. C
RANK(for himself, Mr. TIFFANY, Ms. BOEBERT, Mr. GUEST, and Mrs. 
B
IGGSof South Carolina) submitted the following resolution; which was 
referred to the Committee on the Judiciary 
RESOLUTION 
Expressing Support for the President’s Actions to Safeguard 
National Security and Eliminate Threats from Foreign 
Terrorist Organizations. 
Whereas, on January 20, 2025, President Trump issued Ex-
ecutive Order 14157, designating cartels and other orga-
nizations as Foreign Terrorist Organizations (FTOs) and 
Specially Designated Global Terrorists (SDGTs); 
Whereas Tren de Aragua (TdA), who has been directed to at-
tack U.S. law enforcement officers, was specifically 
named as a FTO under this Executive order; 
Whereas in early February 2025, President Bukele met with 
Secretary of State Marco Rubio and agreed to imprison 
members of Tren de Aragua of behalf of the United 
States; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:29 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR295.IH HR295
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 295 IH 
Whereas, on March 15, 2025, President Trump invoked the 
Alien Enemies Act in response to the infiltration of the 
United States by Tren de Aragua; 
Whereas, on March 15, 2025, two flights carrying noncitizen 
members of Tren de Aragua and the Salvadoran gang 
MS–13 departed U.S. airspace; 
Whereas, on March 16, 2025, El Salvador President Nayib 
Bukele received these two flights and immediately trans-
ferred the SDGTs into El Salvador’s Terrorism Confine-
ment Center (CECOT) for detention. 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) supports the President’s Action to remove 2
foreign terrorists under the Alien Enemies Act, 50 3
U.S.C. 21 et seq.; 4
(2) affirms that, as Commander in Chief, the 5
President has executive authority to detain, deport, 6
or restrict non-citizens from a Foreign Terrorist Or-7
ganization; and 8
(3) endorses the complete elimination of these 9
organizations from the United States to protect the 10
nation’s territory, safety, and security. 11
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:29 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR295.IH HR295
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS