Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR301 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/09/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 301 
Honoring the life and celebrating the birthday of Ulysses S. Grant, America’s 
18th President and native son of Ohio’s Second Congressional District. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL8, 2025 
Mr. T
AYLORsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on Armed Services 
RESOLUTION 
Honoring the life and celebrating the birthday of Ulysses 
S. Grant, America’s 18th President and native son of 
Ohio’s Second Congressional District. 
Whereas, on April 27, 1822, Ulysses S. Grant was born in 
Point Pleasant, Ohio, and lived in Georgetown, Ohio, 
throughout his childhood until 1839, when he left to at-
tend the United States Military Academy at West Point; 
Whereas, after Grant graduated from West Point, he joined 
the 4th Regiment, US Infantry, where he served with dis-
tinction in the Mexican-American War; 
Whereas, over the course of the American Civil War, Grant 
commanded and fought in the battles of Fort Donelson, 
Shiloh, Vicksburg, Chattanooga, the Wilderness, Peters-
burg, and Appomattox; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:00 Apr 09, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR301.IH HR301
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 301 IH 
Whereas Grant was appointed the first Lieutenant General of 
the United States Army after Congress reestablished the 
position in 1864; 
Whereas, on March 4, 1869, Grant was sworn in as the 18th 
President of the United States, officially becoming the 
second Ohioan to serve as President of the United States; 
Whereas, throughout his two terms as President, Grant 
worked on civil rights issues including the establishment 
of the Department of Justice, adoption of the 15th 
Amendment, and other Reconstruction efforts; 
Whereas this resolution honors the 203rd birthday of Presi-
dent Ulysses S. Grant and the 160th anniversary of the 
end of the American Civil War; and 
Whereas the Land of US Grant, Inc., located in Georgetown, 
Ohio, works to promote the legacy of Ulysses S. Grant 
by preserving his boyhood home, school house, tannery, 
native son statue, and murals: Now, therefore be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) honors Ulysses S. Grant and the Land of 2
US Grant, Inc., for their many contributions to Ohio 3
and Ohio’s Second Congressional District; and 4
(2) recognizes that Ulysses S. Grant was piv-5
otal to the Union’s military success in the Civil War 6
and affirms his legacy as a trailblazer for civil rights 7
and Reconstruction efforts. 8
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:00 Apr 09, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR301.IH HR301
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS