1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 304 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Amending House Resolution 211 to ensure that days occurring during the |
---|
6 | 6 | | first session of the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress constitute calendar |
---|
7 | 7 | | days for purposes of section 202 of the National Emergencies Act (50 |
---|
8 | 8 | | U.S.C. 1622) with respect to a joint resolution terminating a national |
---|
9 | 9 | | emergency declared by the President on February 1, 2025. |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
11 | 11 | | APRIL8, 2025 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Mr. K |
---|
13 | 13 | | ENNEDYof New York submitted the following resolution; which was |
---|
14 | 14 | | referred to the Committee on Rules |
---|
15 | 15 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
16 | 16 | | Amending House Resolution 211 to ensure that days occur- |
---|
17 | 17 | | ring during the first session of the One Hundred Nine- |
---|
18 | 18 | | teenth Congress constitute calendar days for purposes |
---|
19 | 19 | | of section 202 of the National Emergencies Act (50 |
---|
20 | 20 | | U.S.C. 1622) with respect to a joint resolution termi- |
---|
21 | 21 | | nating a national emergency declared by the President |
---|
22 | 22 | | on February 1, 2025. |
---|
23 | 23 | | Resolved, 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:59 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR304.IH HR304 |
---|
25 | 25 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | •HRES 304 IH |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 1. ENSURING DAYS OCCURRING DURING FIRST 1 |
---|
28 | 28 | | SESSION CONSTITUTE CALENDAR DAYS FOR 2 |
---|
29 | 29 | | PURPOSES OF JOINT RESOLUTION TERMI-3 |
---|
30 | 30 | | NATING A NATIONAL EMERGENCY DECLARED 4 |
---|
31 | 31 | | BY THE PRESIDENT ON FEBRUARY 1, 2025. 5 |
---|
32 | 32 | | (a) T |
---|
33 | 33 | | REATMENT OF DAYS ASCALENDARDAYS.— 6 |
---|
34 | 34 | | House Resolution 211, agreed to March 11, 2025, is 7 |
---|
35 | 35 | | amended by striking section 4. 8 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (b) E |
---|
37 | 37 | | FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendment made by 9 |
---|
38 | 38 | | subsection (a) shall take effect as if included in the adop-10 |
---|
39 | 39 | | tion of House Resolution 211. 11 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Æ |
---|
41 | 41 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:59 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR304.IH HR304 |
---|
42 | 42 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|