Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR304 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/09/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 304 
Amending House Resolution 211 to ensure that days occurring during the 
first session of the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress constitute calendar 
days for purposes of section 202 of the National Emergencies Act (50 
U.S.C. 1622) with respect to a joint resolution terminating a national 
emergency declared by the President on February 1, 2025. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL8, 2025 
Mr. K
ENNEDYof New York submitted the following resolution; which was 
referred to the Committee on Rules 
RESOLUTION 
Amending House Resolution 211 to ensure that days occur-
ring during the first session of the One Hundred Nine-
teenth Congress constitute calendar days for purposes 
of section 202 of the National Emergencies Act (50 
U.S.C. 1622) with respect to a joint resolution termi-
nating a national emergency declared by the President 
on February 1, 2025. 
Resolved, 1
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:59 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR304.IH HR304
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 304 IH 
SECTION 1. ENSURING DAYS OCCURRING DURING FIRST 1
SESSION CONSTITUTE CALENDAR DAYS FOR 2
PURPOSES OF JOINT RESOLUTION TERMI-3
NATING A NATIONAL EMERGENCY DECLARED 4
BY THE PRESIDENT ON FEBRUARY 1, 2025. 5
(a) T
REATMENT OF DAYS ASCALENDARDAYS.— 6
House Resolution 211, agreed to March 11, 2025, is 7
amended by striking section 4. 8
(b) E
FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendment made by 9
subsection (a) shall take effect as if included in the adop-10
tion of House Resolution 211. 11
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:59 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR304.IH HR304
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS