1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 338 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Expressing support for the designation of April 17, 2025, as ‘‘Cambodian |
---|
6 | 6 | | Genocide Remembrance Day’’ to remember the horrific slaughter of |
---|
7 | 7 | | almost 2,000,000 Cambodian people at the hand of the Khmer Rouge |
---|
8 | 8 | | regime. |
---|
9 | 9 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
10 | 10 | | APRIL17, 2025 |
---|
11 | 11 | | Mrs. T |
---|
12 | 12 | | RAHAN(for herself and Mr. GARCIAof California) submitted the |
---|
13 | 13 | | following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs |
---|
14 | 14 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
15 | 15 | | Expressing support for the designation of April 17, 2025, |
---|
16 | 16 | | as ‘‘Cambodian Genocide Remembrance Day’’ to remem- |
---|
17 | 17 | | ber the horrific slaughter of almost 2,000,000 Cam- |
---|
18 | 18 | | bodian people at the hand of the Khmer Rouge regime. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Whereas, April 17th, 1975, marked the fall of Phnom Penh |
---|
20 | 20 | | to the Khmer Rouge, thereby marking the beginning of |
---|
21 | 21 | | the Cambodian Genocide; |
---|
22 | 22 | | Whereas, beginning on April 17, 1975, and for the next 4 |
---|
23 | 23 | | years, almost 2,000,000 Cambodian people were starved, |
---|
24 | 24 | | tortured, and murdered under the direct orders of the |
---|
25 | 25 | | Khmer Rouge regime and their leader Pol Pot; |
---|
26 | 26 | | Whereas nearly one fourth of the population of Cambodia at |
---|
27 | 27 | | the time were killed during the genocide; |
---|
28 | 28 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:54 Apr 17, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR338.IH HR338 |
---|
29 | 29 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
30 | 30 | | •HRES 338 IH |
---|
31 | 31 | | Whereas, April 17th, 2025, marks the 50th anniversary of |
---|
32 | 32 | | the beginning of the Cambodian Genocide; |
---|
33 | 33 | | Whereas by designating April 17th as a day of remembrance, |
---|
34 | 34 | | the utmost respect and reverence can be given to the lives |
---|
35 | 35 | | that were lost; |
---|
36 | 36 | | Whereas recognizing this day serves to honor those who sur- |
---|
37 | 37 | | vived the genocide with the utmost admiration; |
---|
38 | 38 | | Whereas Cambodian communities have found new beginnings |
---|
39 | 39 | | across the United States, acting as a symbol of resiliency |
---|
40 | 40 | | and strength; |
---|
41 | 41 | | Whereas, in 2019, the cities of Lowell, Los Angeles, and |
---|
42 | 42 | | Long Beach proclaimed April 17th to be Cambodian |
---|
43 | 43 | | Genocide Remembrance Day; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | Whereas, in 2023, the State of Massachusetts proclaimed |
---|
45 | 45 | | April 17th to be Cambodian Genocide Remembrance |
---|
46 | 46 | | Day: Now, therefore, be it |
---|
47 | 47 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (1) supports the principles and values of ‘‘Cam-2 |
---|
49 | 49 | | bodian Genocide Remembrance Day’’; 3 |
---|
50 | 50 | | (2) acknowledges the long and continued strug-4 |
---|
51 | 51 | | gle of the Cambodian people to foster a free and just 5 |
---|
52 | 52 | | democratic process; 6 |
---|
53 | 53 | | (3) further acknowledges the work of the Cam-7 |
---|
54 | 54 | | bodian diaspora community throughout the United 8 |
---|
55 | 55 | | States to gain recognition of the Cambodian Geno-9 |
---|
56 | 56 | | cide by the Federal Government; 10 |
---|
57 | 57 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:54 Apr 17, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR338.IH HR338 |
---|
58 | 58 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 |
---|
59 | 59 | | •HRES 338 IH |
---|
60 | 60 | | (4) encourages all to reflect on the history of 1 |
---|
61 | 61 | | the Cambodian Genocide and the legacy that it has 2 |
---|
62 | 62 | | left, both within Cambodia and abroad; and 3 |
---|
63 | 63 | | (5) requests that the President issue a procla-4 |
---|
64 | 64 | | mation calling upon the people of the United States 5 |
---|
65 | 65 | | to observe such a day with appropriate ceremonies 6 |
---|
66 | 66 | | and activities. 7 |
---|
67 | 67 | | Æ |
---|
68 | 68 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:54 Apr 17, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR338.IH HR338 |
---|
69 | 69 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|