Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR338 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/18/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 338 
Expressing support for the designation of April 17, 2025, as ‘‘Cambodian 
Genocide Remembrance Day’’ to remember the horrific slaughter of 
almost 2,000,000 Cambodian people at the hand of the Khmer Rouge 
regime. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL17, 2025 
Mrs. T
RAHAN(for herself and Mr. GARCIAof California) submitted the 
following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs 
RESOLUTION 
Expressing support for the designation of April 17, 2025, 
as ‘‘Cambodian Genocide Remembrance Day’’ to remem-
ber the horrific slaughter of almost 2,000,000 Cam-
bodian people at the hand of the Khmer Rouge regime. 
Whereas, April 17th, 1975, marked the fall of Phnom Penh 
to the Khmer Rouge, thereby marking the beginning of 
the Cambodian Genocide; 
Whereas, beginning on April 17, 1975, and for the next 4 
years, almost 2,000,000 Cambodian people were starved, 
tortured, and murdered under the direct orders of the 
Khmer Rouge regime and their leader Pol Pot; 
Whereas nearly one fourth of the population of Cambodia at 
the time were killed during the genocide; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:54 Apr 17, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR338.IH HR338
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 338 IH 
Whereas, April 17th, 2025, marks the 50th anniversary of 
the beginning of the Cambodian Genocide; 
Whereas by designating April 17th as a day of remembrance, 
the utmost respect and reverence can be given to the lives 
that were lost; 
Whereas recognizing this day serves to honor those who sur-
vived the genocide with the utmost admiration; 
Whereas Cambodian communities have found new beginnings 
across the United States, acting as a symbol of resiliency 
and strength; 
Whereas, in 2019, the cities of Lowell, Los Angeles, and 
Long Beach proclaimed April 17th to be Cambodian 
Genocide Remembrance Day; and 
Whereas, in 2023, the State of Massachusetts proclaimed 
April 17th to be Cambodian Genocide Remembrance 
Day: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) supports the principles and values of ‘‘Cam-2
bodian Genocide Remembrance Day’’; 3
(2) acknowledges the long and continued strug-4
gle of the Cambodian people to foster a free and just 5
democratic process; 6
(3) further acknowledges the work of the Cam-7
bodian diaspora community throughout the United 8
States to gain recognition of the Cambodian Geno-9
cide by the Federal Government; 10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:54 Apr 17, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR338.IH HR338
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HRES 338 IH 
(4) encourages all to reflect on the history of 1
the Cambodian Genocide and the legacy that it has 2
left, both within Cambodia and abroad; and 3
(5) requests that the President issue a procla-4
mation calling upon the people of the United States 5
to observe such a day with appropriate ceremonies 6
and activities. 7
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:54 Apr 17, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR338.IH HR338
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS