Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR396 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/08/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 396 
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 4, 2025, through 
May 10, 2025, as ‘‘Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week’’. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY7, 2025 
Mr. P
ETERS(for himself, Mr. BILIRAKIS, Mr. MULLIN, and Mr. BEANof 
Florida) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on Energy and Commerce 
RESOLUTION 
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 
4, 2025, through May 10, 2025, as ‘‘Tardive Dyskinesia 
Awareness Week’’. 
Whereas many people living with serious mental illnesses (for 
example, bipolar disorder, major depressive disorder, 
schizophrenia, and schizoaffective disorder) or gastro-
intestinal disorders (for example, gastroparesis, upset 
stomach, nausea, and vomiting) may be treated with 
medications that work as dopamine receptor blocking 
agents, including antipsychotics and antiemetics; 
Whereas, while ongoing treatment with these medications can 
be necessary, prolonged use may be associated with 
tardive dyskinesia (TD), an involuntary movement dis-
order that is characterized by uncontrollable, abnormal, 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:54 May 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR396.IH HR396
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 396 IH 
and repetitive movements of the face, torso, limbs, and 
fingers or toes; 
Whereas even mild symptoms of TD can impact people phys-
ically, socially, and emotionally; 
Whereas it is estimated that TD affects approximately 
600,000 people in the United States, and approximately 
65 percent of people with TD have not been diagnosed, 
making it important to raise awareness about the symp-
toms; 
Whereas it is important that people taking these medications 
be monitored for TD by a health care provider, and reg-
ular screening for TD is recommended by the American 
Psychiatric Association; 
Whereas clinical research has led to approval of treatments 
for adults with TD by the Food and Drug Administra-
tion, and recognition and treatment of TD can make a 
positive impact in the lives of many people experiencing 
psychotic and mood disorders; and 
Whereas the House of Representatives can raise awareness of 
TD among the public and medical community: Now, 
therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) expresses support for the designation of 2
‘‘Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week’’; and 3
(2) encourages each individual in the United 4
States to become better informed about and aware 5
of tardive dyskinesia. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:54 May 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR396.IH HR396
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB