Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR402 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/09/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 402 
Honoring mothers, and recognizing the significance of motherhood and the 
impact mothers have on raising the next generation, on the occasion 
of Mother’s Day. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY8, 2025 
Mr. W
EBERof Texas (for himself, Ms. DELACRUZ, Mrs. HOUCHIN, Mr. 
N
EHLS, Ms. TENNEY, Mr. MOOREof Alabama, Mr. BACON, Mr. CREN-
SHAW, Mr. MOOLENAAR, Mr. RULLI, Mr. MOOREof West Virginia, Mr. 
E
LLZEY, Mr. GILLof Texas, Mrs. MILLERof Illinois, Mr. OWENS, Mr. 
E
ZELL, Mr. SELF, Mr. BABIN, Mr. TONYGONZALESof Texas, Mrs. 
H
INSON, and Mrs. LUNA) submitted the following resolution; which was 
referred to the Committee on Education and Workforce 
RESOLUTION 
Honoring mothers, and recognizing the significance of moth-
erhood and the impact mothers have on raising the next 
generation, on the occasion of Mother’s Day. 
Whereas President Woodrow Wilson issued a Presidential 
proclamation on May 9, 1914, establishing the first na-
tional Mother’s Day holiday to celebrate America’s moth-
ers; 
Whereas Mother’s Day is celebrated around the world, dem-
onstrating the historical significance and universal re-
spect for mothers and motherhood; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:08 May 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR402.IH HR402
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 402 IH 
Whereas, on Mother’s Day, families are blessed with the op-
portunity to celebrate their mothers, the sacrifices moth-
ers make daily, and everything motherhood represents; 
Whereas mothers are responsible for raising the next genera-
tion and deserve to be celebrated for the special ability 
only they have to bring life into this world; 
Whereas mothers are both strong and nurturing, traits which 
are critical to the development of their progeny; 
Whereas mothers such as stepmothers, adopted mothers, and 
single mothers are also vital to the fabric of this Nation 
and the story of motherhood; 
Whereas the definition of ‘‘mother’’ has come under attack 
in recent years from various groups that seek to diminish 
the significance of motherhood; 
Whereas redefining motherhood attacks the fundamental 
truth of the human experience and ignores the intrinsic 
capability women have to become mothers; 
Whereas the terms ‘‘birthing person’’, ‘‘gestational parent’’, 
‘‘chest feeder’’, ‘‘menstruating people’’, ‘‘pregnant peo-
ple’’, and ‘‘people with a capacity for pregnancy’’, among 
others, diminish the significance of motherhood; 
Whereas, in the 117th Congress, Democrats incomprehensibly 
passed legislation that eliminated the term ‘‘mother’’ 
from the House Rules, tantamount to an attack on moth-
erhood at the most fundamental level; 
Whereas mothers are, by basic logic and commonsense defini-
tion, women; and 
Whereas, on Sunday, May 11, 2025, the United States will 
celebrate Mother’s Day, thus providing Americans the op-
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:08 May 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR402.IH HR402
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HRES 402 IH 
portunity to express their love and reverence for the 
mothers of this Nation: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) supports policies that recognize mothers as 2
mothers; 3
(2) acknowledges that Mother’s Day is intended 4
specifically to commemorate motherhood and to 5
honor the mothers of the United States; 6
(3) recognizes the importance of motherhood, 7
the sacrifices women make when choosing to raise a 8
family, and the invaluable contributions of mother-9
hood to the family, community, States, and country 10
as a whole; and 11
(4) encourages the people of the United States 12
to observe Mother’s Day in celebration of the women 13
who have chosen to bring life into the world and 14
nurture the next generation. 15
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:08 May 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR402.IH HR402
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB