Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR79 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 IV
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION H. RES. 79
55 Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Veterans’ Affairs
66 in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress.
77 IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88 JANUARY31, 2025
99 Mr. B
1010 OSTsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the
1111 Committee on House Administration
1212 RESOLUTION
1313 Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on
1414 Veterans’ Affairs in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress.
1515 Resolved, 1
1616 SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2
1717 For the expenses of the Committee on Veterans’ Af-3
1818 fairs (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the ‘‘Com-4
1919 mittee’’), including the expenses of all staff salaries, there 5
2020 shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the House 6
2121 of Representatives for committee salaries and expenses, 7
2222 not more than $12,136,370 for the One Hundred Nine-8
2323 teenth Congress. 9
2424 VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:19 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR79.IH HR79
2525 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2
2626 •HRES 79 IH
2727 SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1
2828 Of the amount specified in section 1— 2
2929 (1) not more than $5,985,270 shall be available 3
3030 for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 4
3131 noon on January 3, 2025, and ending immediately 5
3232 before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6
3333 (2) not more than $6,151,100 shall be available 7
3434 for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 8
3535 noon on January 3, 2026, and ending immediately 9
3636 before noon on January 3, 2027. 10
3737 SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11
3838 Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12
3939 vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13
4040 Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14
4141 directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15
4242 SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16
4343 Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17
4444 be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18
4545 the Committee on House Administration. 19
4646 Æ
4747 VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:19 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR79.IH HR79
4848 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB