Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR79 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 79 
Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Veterans’ Affairs 
in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY31, 2025 
Mr. B
OSTsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on House Administration 
RESOLUTION 
Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on 
Veterans’ Affairs in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 
Resolved, 1
SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2
For the expenses of the Committee on Veterans’ Af-3
fairs (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the ‘‘Com-4
mittee’’), including the expenses of all staff salaries, there 5
shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the House 6
of Representatives for committee salaries and expenses, 7
not more than $12,136,370 for the One Hundred Nine-8
teenth Congress. 9
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:19 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR79.IH HR79
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 79 IH 
SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1
Of the amount specified in section 1— 2
(1) not more than $5,985,270 shall be available 3
for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 4
noon on January 3, 2025, and ending immediately 5
before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6
(2) not more than $6,151,100 shall be available 7
for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 8
noon on January 3, 2026, and ending immediately 9
before noon on January 3, 2027. 10
SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11
Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12
vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13
Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14
directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15
SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16
Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17
be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18
the Committee on House Administration. 19
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:19 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR79.IH HR79
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB