1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 9 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Reaffirming that the United States is not a party to the Rome Statute |
---|
6 | 6 | | and does not recognize the jurisdiction of the International Criminal Court. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | JANUARY3, 2025 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. B |
---|
10 | 10 | | IGGSof Arizona submitted the following resolution; which was referred |
---|
11 | 11 | | to the Committee on Foreign Affairs |
---|
12 | 12 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
13 | 13 | | Reaffirming that the United States is not a party to the |
---|
14 | 14 | | Rome Statute and does not recognize the jurisdiction |
---|
15 | 15 | | of the International Criminal Court. |
---|
16 | 16 | | Whereas the Constitution requires approval from two-thirds |
---|
17 | 17 | | of the Senators present for ratification and confirmation |
---|
18 | 18 | | of international treaties; |
---|
19 | 19 | | Whereas President Bill Clinton signed the Rome Statute on |
---|
20 | 20 | | December 31, 2000, but did not submit the treaty to the |
---|
21 | 21 | | Senate for ratification; |
---|
22 | 22 | | Whereas, on May 6, 2002, the Bush administration an- |
---|
23 | 23 | | nounced that the United States does not intend to be- |
---|
24 | 24 | | come a party to the Rome Statute of the International |
---|
25 | 25 | | Criminal Court; |
---|
26 | 26 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:17 Jan 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR9.IH HR9 |
---|
27 | 27 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
28 | 28 | | •HRES 9 IH |
---|
29 | 29 | | Whereas Article 125 of the Rome Statute states that it is |
---|
30 | 30 | | ‘‘subject to ratification, acceptance, or approval by signa- |
---|
31 | 31 | | tory States’’; |
---|
32 | 32 | | Whereas, on May 20, 2024, the Prosecutor of the Inter- |
---|
33 | 33 | | national Criminal Court, Karim Khan, took unprece- |
---|
34 | 34 | | dented measures announcing arrest warrant applications |
---|
35 | 35 | | for Israeli Prime Minister Benjamin Netanyahu and Min- |
---|
36 | 36 | | ister of Defense Yoav Gallant; |
---|
37 | 37 | | Whereas the United States and Israel are not parties to the |
---|
38 | 38 | | Rome Statute or members of the International Criminal |
---|
39 | 39 | | Court; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | Whereas the United States does not recognize the legitimacy |
---|
41 | 41 | | or jurisdiction of the International Criminal Court: Now, |
---|
42 | 42 | | therefore, be it |
---|
43 | 43 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
44 | 44 | | (1) reaffirms that the United States is not a 2 |
---|
45 | 45 | | party to the Rome Statute and does not recognize 3 |
---|
46 | 46 | | the jurisdiction of the International Criminal Court; 4 |
---|
47 | 47 | | (2) condemns the International Criminal 5 |
---|
48 | 48 | | Court’s issuance of arrest warrant applications for 6 |
---|
49 | 49 | | Israeli Prime Minister Benjamin Netanyahu and 7 |
---|
50 | 50 | | Minister of Defense Yoav Gallant; and 8 |
---|
51 | 51 | | (3) reiterates its unwavering support for the 9 |
---|
52 | 52 | | State of Israel and its right to defend itself and its 10 |
---|
53 | 53 | | leaders from unwarranted international legal actions. 11 |
---|
54 | 54 | | Æ |
---|
55 | 55 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:17 Jan 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR9.IH HR9 |
---|
56 | 56 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|