Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR9 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/06/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 9 
Reaffirming that the United States is not a party to the Rome Statute 
and does not recognize the jurisdiction of the International Criminal Court. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY3, 2025 
Mr. B
IGGSof Arizona submitted the following resolution; which was referred 
to the Committee on Foreign Affairs 
RESOLUTION 
Reaffirming that the United States is not a party to the 
Rome Statute and does not recognize the jurisdiction 
of the International Criminal Court. 
Whereas the Constitution requires approval from two-thirds 
of the Senators present for ratification and confirmation 
of international treaties; 
Whereas President Bill Clinton signed the Rome Statute on 
December 31, 2000, but did not submit the treaty to the 
Senate for ratification; 
Whereas, on May 6, 2002, the Bush administration an-
nounced that the United States does not intend to be-
come a party to the Rome Statute of the International 
Criminal Court; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:17 Jan 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR9.IH HR9
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 9 IH 
Whereas Article 125 of the Rome Statute states that it is 
‘‘subject to ratification, acceptance, or approval by signa-
tory States’’; 
Whereas, on May 20, 2024, the Prosecutor of the Inter-
national Criminal Court, Karim Khan, took unprece-
dented measures announcing arrest warrant applications 
for Israeli Prime Minister Benjamin Netanyahu and Min-
ister of Defense Yoav Gallant; 
Whereas the United States and Israel are not parties to the 
Rome Statute or members of the International Criminal 
Court; and 
Whereas the United States does not recognize the legitimacy 
or jurisdiction of the International Criminal Court: Now, 
therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) reaffirms that the United States is not a 2
party to the Rome Statute and does not recognize 3
the jurisdiction of the International Criminal Court; 4
(2) condemns the International Criminal 5
Court’s issuance of arrest warrant applications for 6
Israeli Prime Minister Benjamin Netanyahu and 7
Minister of Defense Yoav Gallant; and 8
(3) reiterates its unwavering support for the 9
State of Israel and its right to defend itself and its 10
leaders from unwarranted international legal actions. 11
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:17 Jan 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR9.IH HR9
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB