1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 91 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on the Budget in |
---|
6 | 6 | | the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | FEBRUARY4, 2025 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. A |
---|
10 | 10 | | RRINGTONsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the |
---|
11 | 11 | | Committee on House Administration |
---|
12 | 12 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
13 | 13 | | Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on |
---|
14 | 14 | | the Budget in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. |
---|
15 | 15 | | Resolved, 1 |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2 |
---|
17 | 17 | | For the expenses of the Committee on the Budget 3 |
---|
18 | 18 | | (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the ‘‘Com-4 |
---|
19 | 19 | | mittee’’), including the expenses of all staff salaries, there 5 |
---|
20 | 20 | | shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the House 6 |
---|
21 | 21 | | of Representatives for committee salaries and expenses, 7 |
---|
22 | 22 | | not more than $11,990,000 for the One Hundred Nine-8 |
---|
23 | 23 | | teenth Congress. 9 |
---|
24 | 24 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:03 Feb 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR91.IH HR91 |
---|
25 | 25 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | •HRES 91 IH |
---|
27 | 27 | | SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Of the amount specified in section 1— 2 |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) not more than $5,995,000 shall be available 3 |
---|
30 | 30 | | for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 4 |
---|
31 | 31 | | noon on January 3, 2025, and ending immediately 5 |
---|
32 | 32 | | before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6 |
---|
33 | 33 | | (2) not more than $5,995,000 shall be available 7 |
---|
34 | 34 | | for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 8 |
---|
35 | 35 | | noon on January 3, 2026, and ending immediately 9 |
---|
36 | 36 | | before noon on January 3, 2027. 10 |
---|
37 | 37 | | SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11 |
---|
38 | 38 | | Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12 |
---|
39 | 39 | | vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14 |
---|
41 | 41 | | directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15 |
---|
42 | 42 | | SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16 |
---|
43 | 43 | | Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17 |
---|
44 | 44 | | be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18 |
---|
45 | 45 | | the Committee on House Administration. 19 |
---|
46 | 46 | | Æ |
---|
47 | 47 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:03 Feb 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR91.IH HR91 |
---|
48 | 48 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|