IV 119THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION H. RES. 91 Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on the Budget in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES FEBRUARY4, 2025 Mr. A RRINGTONsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on House Administration RESOLUTION Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on the Budget in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. Resolved, 1 SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2 For the expenses of the Committee on the Budget 3 (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the ‘‘Com-4 mittee’’), including the expenses of all staff salaries, there 5 shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the House 6 of Representatives for committee salaries and expenses, 7 not more than $11,990,000 for the One Hundred Nine-8 teenth Congress. 9 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:03 Feb 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR91.IH HR91 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 •HRES 91 IH SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1 Of the amount specified in section 1— 2 (1) not more than $5,995,000 shall be available 3 for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 4 noon on January 3, 2025, and ending immediately 5 before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6 (2) not more than $5,995,000 shall be available 7 for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 8 noon on January 3, 2026, and ending immediately 9 before noon on January 3, 2027. 10 SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11 Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12 vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13 Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14 directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15 SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16 Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17 be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18 the Committee on House Administration. 19 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:03 Feb 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR91.IH HR91 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS