Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB1168 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/11/2025

                            II 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 1168 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide coverage of 
portable ultrasound transportation and set up services under the Medi-
care program. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
MARCH27, 2025 
Mr. C
ORNYN(for himself and Ms. HASSAN) introduced the following bill; 
which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance 
A BILL 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide 
coverage of portable ultrasound transportation and set 
up services under the Medicare program. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Portable Ultrasound 4
Reimbursement Equity Act of 2025’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:53 Apr 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1168.IS S1168
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•S 1168 IS
SEC. 2. COVERAGE OF PORTABLE ULTRASOUND TRANS-1
PORTATION AND SET UP SERVICES UNDER 2
THE MEDICARE PROGRAM. 3
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Section 1861(s)(3) of the Social 4
Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395x(s)(3)) is amended by strik-5
ing ‘‘diagnostic X-ray tests’’ and inserting ‘‘diagnostic X- 6
ray and ultrasound tests’’. 7
(b) E
NSURINGEQUITABLEPAYMENT FORPORTABLE 8
U
LTRASOUND TRANSPORTATION SERVICES.—Section 9
1834 of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395m) is 10
amended by adding at the end the following new sub-11
section: 12
‘‘(aa) E
NSURINGEQUITABLEPAYMENT FORPORT-13
ABLEULTRASOUND TRANSPORTATION AND SETUP 14
S
ERVICES.— 15
‘‘(1) I
N GENERAL.—The Secretary shall provide 16
a separate payment under this part for portable 17
ultrasound transportation and set up services in the 18
same manner and to the same extent that separate 19
payments are provided for portable X-ray transpor-20
tation and set up services. 21
‘‘(2) P
AYMENT REQUIREMENTS .—The Sec-22
retary shall specify requirements applicable to sup-23
pliers of portable ultrasound transportation and set 24
up services under this part. Such requirements shall 25
be substantially similar to the requirements applica-26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:04 Apr 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1168.IS S1168
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•S 1168 IS
ble to suppliers of portable X-ray services under sub-1
part C of part 486 of title 42, Code of Federal Reg-2
ulations (or a successor regulation).’’. 3
(c) E
FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendments made by 4
this section shall apply with respect to services furnished 5
on or after January 1, 2027. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:53 Apr 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S1168.IS S1168
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB