Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB824 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 II
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION S. 824
55 To reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program.
66 IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
77 MARCH4, 2025
88 Mr. K
99 ENNEDY(for himself and Mr. CASSIDY) introduced the following bill;
1010 which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Hous-
1111 ing, and Urban Affairs
1212 A BILL
1313 To reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program.
1414 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
1515 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
1616 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
1717 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘NFIP Extension Act 4
1818 of 2025’’. 5
1919 SEC. 2. REAUTHORIZATION. 6
2020 (a) F
2121 INANCING.—Section 1309(a) of the National 7
2222 Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4016(a)) is 8
2323 amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ and inserting 9
2424 ‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 10
2525 VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:16 Mar 18, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S824.IS S824
2626 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2
2727 •S 824 IS
2828 (b) PROGRAMEXPIRATION.—Section 1319 of the Na-1
2929 tional Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4026) is 2
3030 amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ and inserting 3
3131 ‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 4
3232 (c) R
3333 ETROACTIVEEFFECTIVEDATE.—If this Act is 5
3434 enacted after March 14, 2025, the amendments made by 6
3535 subsections (a) and (b) shall take effect as if enacted on 7
3636 March 14, 2025. 8
3737 Æ
3838 VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:16 Mar 18, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S824.IS S824
3939 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB