Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB824 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/25/2025

                            II 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 824 
To reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
MARCH4, 2025 
Mr. K
ENNEDY(for himself and Mr. CASSIDY) introduced the following bill; 
which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Hous-
ing, and Urban Affairs 
A BILL 
To reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘NFIP Extension Act 4
of 2025’’. 5
SEC. 2. REAUTHORIZATION. 6
(a) F
INANCING.—Section 1309(a) of the National 7
Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4016(a)) is 8
amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ and inserting 9
‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:16 Mar 18, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S824.IS S824
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•S 824 IS
(b) PROGRAMEXPIRATION.—Section 1319 of the Na-1
tional Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4026) is 2
amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ and inserting 3
‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 4
(c) R
ETROACTIVEEFFECTIVEDATE.—If this Act is 5
enacted after March 14, 2025, the amendments made by 6
subsections (a) and (b) shall take effect as if enacted on 7
March 14, 2025. 8
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:16 Mar 18, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S824.IS S824
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB