Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023
Fiscal Note January 25, 2023
Fiscal Note January 19, 2023
Fiscal Note January 9, 2023
Bill December 20, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis January 24, 2023
Analysis January 18, 2023