Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 10, 2023
Fiscal Note February 9, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Fiscal Note January 18, 2023
Bill December 20, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023