House | 03/03/2023 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | House/ failed in Clerk of the House | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | ||
12/20/2022 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |||
12/20/2022 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |||
12/20/2022 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |