Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 27, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 20, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023
Fiscal Note February 8, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023