Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note February 12, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 25, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023