Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0417 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note February 13, 2023
Fiscal Note February 9, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023

Amended

Bill February 14, 2023