Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 1, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note February 13, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Amended

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 27, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023